Smith v. Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00156 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Latrell Smith
1123 Kielder Court
Fort Worth, TX 76134 |
GPO
Mar 01 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER finding as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/1/2017) (npk) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Wed 03/01 1:20 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. The complaint of plaintiff, Laura Latrell Smith, against defendants, Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner and Engel and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, be, and is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/1/2017) (npk) |
|
11 | 11
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Wed 03/01 1:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER finding as moot9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/1/2017) (npk) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/01 1:21 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Wed Mar 1 13:21:02 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/01 1:21 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Wed Mar 1 13:21:21 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/24 2:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel. (npk) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Fri 02/24 2:54 PM
MOTION under 12(b)(6) to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engel with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (npk) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 1:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (npk) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 1:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (npk) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (npk) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 1:24 PM
Judge McBryde's paper original and copies received pursuant to Standing Order re:1 Notice of Removal, from Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (npk) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) p. 50-98 | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Fri 02/17 4:01 PM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 2/17/2017) (npk) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 02/17 4:01 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
McBryde
Fri 02/17 4:00 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 1 Tarrant County TX, case number 2017-000793-1 filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8219374) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) index of all exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) supplemental civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) state court docket/transaction sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) plaintiff's original petition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) signed TRO, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) service request form, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) civil case information sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) statement of inability to afford payment, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) bond receipt, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) certificate regarding opposing counsel, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) citations, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) certificate of cash deposit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) defendant barrett daffin original answer, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) defendant wells fargo's original answer, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) tarrant central appraisal district valuation for property, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) notice of consent | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/17 4:04 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Fri Feb 17 16:04:15 CST 2017 (crt) |