Perry v. USA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00157 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Mail Returned (Public Entry)
Fri 07/12 2:24 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.8 Certificate of Appealability Denied,9 Judgment, received back from Tony Lee Perry as Not at this Institution. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (wxc) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Tue 06/25 4:44 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Tony Lee Perry's motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 (ECF No.1 ) is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) |
|
8 | 8
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied
Tue 06/25 4:43 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and,ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/25 4:44 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8, 9. Tue Jun 25 16:44:58 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 11/01 8:10 PM
RESPONSE filed by USA re:1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255,, (Falconer-DOJ, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/19 11:47 AM
ORDER: After review of the government's motion for an extension of time to file a response to Perry's 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion, and for the reasons contained in it, the Court GRANTS the motion. Accordingly, the government shall file its response no later than November 2, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/19/2017) (plp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 09/19 11:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 19 11:48:07 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 09/18 2:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255,, filed by USA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Falconer-DOJ, Emily) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
Sun 07/30 6:55 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Emily Baker Falconer-DOJ added as AUSA. (Falconer-DOJ, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Tue 07/18 9:25 AM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Wes Hendrix-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/18/2017) (trt) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 07/18 9:25 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Jul 18 09:25:36 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 02/17 3:19 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Fri 02/17 3:16 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:14-CR-78-O) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) |
|
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Fri 02/17 3:18 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to No court file needed. (wxc) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/17 3:21 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Fri Feb 17 15:21:42 CST 2017 (crt) |