Simmons v. Wylie et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00159 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 18, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
KSW CPA, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Richard Wylie
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Dan Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Wylie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KSW CPA, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Center Street, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Simmons
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Sekure Connect, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Financial Worx, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
DS Family, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
KSW CPA, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Richard Wylie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Remark
Wed 08/09 1:35 PM
Letter of remand, public docket sheet, certified copies of37 Order, and38 Final Judgment of Remand mailed to the 141st Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, TX on 08/09/2017. (tln) |
|
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Wed 08/09 1:25 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT OF REMAND: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby REMANDED to the 141st Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne by the party incurring same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/9/2017) (tln) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Wed 08/09 1:23 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Remand. It is, therefore, ORDERED that all remaining claims in this cause are REMANDED to the 141st Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/9/2017) (tln) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
answer
Answer to Counterclaim Answer to Third Party Complaint
Fri 08/04 10:16 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC. Related document:35 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,, ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC. Related document:35 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 07/14 12:19 PM
Third Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Richard Wylie, KSW CPA, P.C., HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against DS Family, L.P., Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC, Sekure Connect, Ltd., Financial Worx, Ltd. filed by Richard Wylie, KSW CPA, P.C., HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Dan Simmons filed by Richard Wylie, KSW CPA, P.C., HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.Attorney Mark S Whitburn added to party HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.(pty:cc), Attorney Mark S Whitburn added to party KSW CPA, P.C.(pty:cc), Attorney Mark S Whitburn added to party Richard Wylie(pty:cc) (Whitburn, Mark) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 07/14 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Whitburn on behalf of HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C., KSW CPA, P.C., Richard Wylie. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Whitburn, Mark) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 06/26 3:57 PM
ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING21 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Verified Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief. The proposed pleading attached to the motion for leave will not, however, be filed. That pleading is designated Defendant's "Third Amended and Supplemental" pleading, which begs the question whether Defendants intend this new pleading, in which they drop their cursory reference to the Lanham Act, to entirely supercede their former pleadings. As a result, Defendants shall have until July 14, 2017, to file a pleading entitled "Defendants' Third Amended Verified Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief." Defendants shall ensure that the third amended pleading they file by July 14 complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. Defendants' Motion to Remand (doc.20 ) will remain under consideration until after the Court has an opportunity to review Defendants' third amended pleading. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/26/2017) (tln) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 04/03 1:49 PM
Appendix in Support filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re31 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Smythe, Peter) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 04/03 1:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re30 Response/Objection (Smythe, Peter) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 04/03 1:45 PM
RESPONSE filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re:20 MOTION to Remand (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Unfiling Pleading
Fri 03/31 10:17 AM
Order Unfiling22 Response,23 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC, Financial Worx, Ltd., DS Family, L.P., Sekure Connect, Ltd. due to the following deficiency: The motion or response must include documentary or non-documentary evidence in a separate appendix; Additional copies are required; Other: See also LR 7.1(i)(4) ; 7.2(e); and Judge Means's specific requirements II(B), available at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judges /tmeans_req.html. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/30/2017) (tln) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply
Thu 03/30 4:57 PM
REPLY filed by HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C. re:26 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Roberts, Ronald) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/24 1:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re:26 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Wed 03/22 3:32 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: No later than April 12, 2017, Simmons shall show cause, in writing, as to why this case should not be remanded to state court. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in the remand of this case to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/22/2017) (tln) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 03/17 1:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re24 Response/Objection, (Smythe, Peter) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/17 1:46 PM
RESPONSE filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re:21 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Verified Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief (Smythe, Peter) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 03/17 1:44 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re22 Response/Objection (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits/Appendix | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/17 1:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC re:20 MOTION to Remand (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File
Wed 03/08 4:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Verified Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief filed by HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C. (Roberts, Ronald) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Remand
Wed 03/08 4:34 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C. (Roberts, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #7 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Defendants Second Amended and Supplemental Verified Answer, Counterclaim and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief, | ||
Att: 2 Simmons Parties Motion to Compel and for Expenses, | ||
Att: 3 Motion to Reset Deadlines for Designating Expert Witness, | ||
Att: 4 Simmonss Objections and First Amended Response to Center Street, Ltd.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 5 Confirmation Letter Regarding Hearings, | ||
Att: 6 DS Family, LPs First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 7 DS Family, LPs First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence) Part 2, | ||
Att: 8 Letter Regarding Motion to Compel Hearing, | ||
Att: 9 Motion for Protective Order for HMSW CPA, PLLC, | ||
Att: 10 Letter Confirming Defendants Second Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Protective Order for HMSW CPA, | ||
Att: 11 The Simmons Parties Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 12 Letter Confirming Simmons Parties Motion for Protective Order Hearing, | ||
Att: 13 Plaintiffs Third Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 14 Defendants Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 15 Defendants Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Plaintiff (2), | ||
Att: 16 Dan Simmonss Second Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 17 Dan Simmonss Second Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes) Part 2, | ||
Att: 18 The Simmons Parties First Amended No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 19 Letter Regarding Simmons Parties Motions for Summary Judgment | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #6 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Defendants Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Plaintiff, Dan Simmons, | ||
Att: 2 Simmonss Objections and Response to Center Street, Ltd.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 KSW CPA, P.C.s Motion to Compel Discovery from Sekure Connect, Ltd., | ||
Att: 4 KSW CPA, P.C.s Motion to Compel Discovery from DS Family, L.P., | ||
Att: 5 KSW CPA, P.C.s Motion to Compel Discovery from Financial Worx, Ltd., | ||
Att: 6 HMSW CPA, PLLCs Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 7 Defendants Verified Motion for Continuance of Hearing on DS Family, LPs No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 8 Defendants Verified Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Sekure Connect, Ltd.s No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 9 Defendants Verified Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Financial Worx, Ltd.s No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 10 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Unjust Enrichment), | ||
Att: 11 Letter From Roberts Concerning Hearings, | ||
Att: 12 Defendants Verified Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Simmons Parties No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 13 Non-Movants Amended Response to Sekure Connect, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 14 Non-Movants Amended Response to Financial Worx, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 15 Non-Movants Amended Response to DS Family, LPs Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 16 Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 17 Defendants Amended Response to Plaintiffs Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 18 Defendants Second Amended and Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 19 Financial Worx, Ltd.s Objections and Reply to the Wylie Parties Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 20 DS Family, LPs Objections and Reply to the Wylie Parties Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 21 Sekure Connect, Ltd.s Objections and Reply to the Wylie Parties Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 22 Objections to Wylies Second Supplemental and Amended Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 23 Supplemental Objections to Wylies Second Supplemental and Amended Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 24 Objections to Defendants Response to Simmons Parties No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment (No-Evidence Motion), | ||
Att: 25 Defendants Motion for Leave to File Corrected Affidavit of Richard E. Wylie, | ||
Att: 26 Brief in Support of Respondents, the Wylie Parties, Requested Relief, | ||
Att: 27 Brief in Support of Respondents, the Wylie Parties, Requested Relief Part 2 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #5 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 The Simmons Parties Original Answer to Center Street, Ltd.s Petition in Intervention, | ||
Att: 2 Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting, | ||
Att: 3 Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting (Supplement Certificate of Conference), | ||
Att: 4 Letter Regarding Hearing on Simmonss Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting, | ||
Att: 5 Letter Regarding Hearing on Simmonss Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting (2), | ||
Att: 6 Non-Movants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting, | ||
Att: 7 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 8 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (Signed), | ||
Att: 9 Letter Regarding Hearings on Motions for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 10 Financial Worx, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 11 Sekure Connect, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 12 DS Family, LPs Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 13 Letter Regarding Hearings on Motions for Summary Judgment (Third-Party Defendants), | ||
Att: 14 Notice of Intent to Offer Evidence Pursuant to Texas Rules of Evidence 803(6) and 902(10), | ||
Att: 15 Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Designation, | ||
Att: 16 Simmons Parties First Amended Designation of Experts, | ||
Att: 17 Letter Regarding Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Designation, | ||
Att: 18 Dan Simmonss Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 19 Dan Simmonss Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes) Part 2, | ||
Att: 20 Letter Regarding Hearing on Dan Simmonss Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 21 Non-Movants Response to Sekure Connect, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 22 Non-Movants Response to DS Family, LPs Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 23 Non-Movants Response to Financial Worx, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Traditional and No Evidence), | ||
Att: 24 Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Designation, | ||
Att: 25 KSW CPA, P.C.s Motion to Compel Production from Simmons & Associates of North Texas, P.C., | ||
Att: 26 Richard Wylies Motion to Compel Production from Dan Simmons, | ||
Att: 27 Defendants Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Designation | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #4 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Citation Return Sekure Connect, Ltd., | ||
Att: 2 Citation Return Financial Worx, Ltd., | ||
Att: 3 Citation Return DS Family, LP, | ||
Att: 4 Reply to Wylies Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order on Objections to Wylies Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 6 Objections to Wylies Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 7 Objections to Wylies Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (No-Evidence Motion), | ||
Att: 8 Order on Objections to Wylies Response to Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (No Evidence) (Proposed), | ||
Att: 9 Letter Regarding Hearing on Defendants Second Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 10 Order Granting Nonsuit of Third-Party Defendant, Simmons & Associates of Texas, P.C. (Proposed), | ||
Att: 11 Notice of Nonsuit of Third-Party Defendant, Simmons & Associates of Texas, P.C., | ||
Att: 12 Order Granting Nonsuit of Third-Party Defendant, Simmons & Associates of Texas, P.C., | ||
Att: 13 Third-Party Defendant DS Family, L.P.s Original Answer, | ||
Att: 14 Third-Party Defendant Sekure Connect, Ltd.s Original Answer, | ||
Att: 15 Third-Party Defendant Financial Worx, Ltd.s Original Answer, | ||
Att: 16 Witness Subpoena Return Katherine Kim, | ||
Att: 17 Response to Defendants Second Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 18 Defendant HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.'s First Amended Answer, | ||
Att: 19 Petition in Intervention, | ||
Att: 20 Defendants Designation of Expert Witnesses, | ||
Att: 21 Simmons Parties Designation of Experts, | ||
Att: 22 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 23 Defendants First Amended and Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses, | ||
Att: 24 Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions, | ||
Att: 25 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Rice), | ||
Att: 26 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Sharp), | ||
Att: 27 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Wylie, Coye), | ||
Att: 28 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Wylie, Richard) | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #3 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Agreed Order Lifting Abatement (Proposed), | ||
Att: 2 Vacation Letter (Peter C. Smythe), | ||
Att: 3 Agreed Order Lifting Abatement, | ||
Att: 4 Order of Dismissal/Non-Suit, | ||
Att: 5 The Simmons Parties Second Amended Answer to the Wiley Parties Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims, | ||
Att: 6 Defendants Second Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 7 Plaintiffs Second Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 8 The Simmons Parties' No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 9 Return of Citation to HMSW CPA, PLLC, | ||
Att: 10 Citation Return HMSW CPA, PLLC, | ||
Att: 11 Dan Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 12 Dan Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes) Part 2, | ||
Att: 13 Letter Notice of Hearings (MSJs), | ||
Att: 14 Letter Notice of Hearings (Amended), | ||
Att: 15 Supplement to Dan Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 16 Defendants Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Dan Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 17 Defendants Verified Motion for Continuance of Hearings on Simmons Parties No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 18 Defendants First Amended and Supplemental Verified Answer, Counterclaim and Request for Equitable and Declaratory Relief, | ||
Att: 19 Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 20 Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing (No Evidence), | ||
Att: 21 Defendants Response to Dan Simmonss Motion for Summary Judgment (Promissory Notes), | ||
Att: 22 Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for No Evidence Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 23 E-Filing Service Request Form (Financial Worx), | ||
Att: 24 E-Filing Service Request Form (Sekure Connect, Ltd.), | ||
Att: 25 E-Filing Service Request (DS Family, LP), | ||
Att: 26 Cover Letter for Motion for Continuance, | ||
Att: 27 Defendant HMSW CPA, P.L.L.C.s Original Answer | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #2 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Letter Confirming Hearing of Special Exceptions, | ||
Att: 2 Plaintiffs Notice of Nonsuit of Kiblinger, Simmons & Wylie, L.L.P., | ||
Att: 3 Simmonss Response to Community Banks Motion to Abate and Motion to Enforce Rule 11 Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Rule 11 Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Bankruptcy, | ||
Att: 6 Defendants Response to Community Banks Intervention and Verified Motion to Abate, and in the Alternative, Second Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 7 Community Banks Reply to Simmonss Response to Community Banks Motion to Abate and Motion to Enforce Rule 11 Agreement, | ||
Att: 8 Simmonss Response to the Wylie Defendants Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 9 Order Granting Community Banks Motion to Abate, | ||
Att: 10 Vacation Letter White (June), | ||
Att: 11 Vacation Letter White (Sept), | ||
Att: 12 Letter with Firms New Phone Number, | ||
Att: 13 Notice of Dismissal for the 141st Judicial District Court, | ||
Att: 14 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Retain, | ||
Att: 15 Order on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Retain (Proposed), | ||
Att: 16 Order on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Retain, | ||
Att: 17 Notice of Change of Address, | ||
Att: 18 Setting Order, | ||
Att: 19 Defendants Motion for Continuance of Final Trial and Request to Reset Deadlines Under Discovery Control Plan/Trial Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 20 Letter Regarding Notice of Hearing - Motion to Continue Final Trial, | ||
Att: 21 Plaintiffs and Third Parties Motion for Continuance, | ||
Att: 22 Trial Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 23 Community Banks Motion to Lift Abatement of Cause, | ||
Att: 24 Order of Dismissal/Non-suit (Proposed), | ||
Att: 25 Community Banks Uncontested Motion to Dismiss/Non-Suit | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents #1 re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiffs Original Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Citation Issued on Richard Wylie, | ||
Att: 3 Community Banks Plea in Intervention, | ||
Att: 4 Defendants Original Answer, Special Exceptions, Counterclaim and Request for Injunctive, Equitable, and Declaratory Relief, | ||
Att: 5 Citation Issued on Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC, | ||
Att: 6 Third Party Defendants Original Answer, | ||
Att: 7 Dan Simmonss Original Answer, | ||
Att: 8 Letter to Counsel, | ||
Att: 9 Defendants First Verified Answer, Counterclaim and Request for Injunctive, Equitable, and Declaratory Relief, | ||
Att: 10 Third Party Defendants First Amended Answer, | ||
Att: 11 Community Banks Verified Motion to Abate and in the Alternative, First Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 12 Simmonss Original Answer to Community Banks Plea in Intervention or First Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 13 Letter Requesting Jury Trial, | ||
Att: 14 Discovery Control Plan/Trial Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 15 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Notices of Intention to Take Oral/Video Depositions of Kent Sharp and Katie Kim, | ||
Att: 16 Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 17 Letter Confirming Hearing for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 18 Community Banks Verified Motion to Abate, and in the Alternative, Second Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 19 Letter Confirming Hearing on Motion to Abate, | ||
Att: 20 Vacation Letter White, | ||
Att: 21 Simmonss Special Exceptions, | ||
Att: 22 The Simmons Parties First Amended Answer to the Wiley Defendants Petition and Counterclaims, | ||
Att: 23 The Simmons Parties First Amended Answer to Community Banks Petition in Intervention, | ||
Att: 24 Plaintiffs First Amended Petition | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Unfiling Pleading
Thu 02/23 11:09 AM
Order Unfiling2 Notice (Other),3 Notice (Other),4 Notice (Other),5 Notice (Other),6 Notice (Other),7 Notice (Other),8 Notice (Other), filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC, due to the following deficiency: Additional copies are required. See LR 5.1(b) or LCrR 49.2(b); Local Civil Rule 81.1(a)(4)(C) requires that a copy of each document filed in state court prior to removal be provided with BOTH the original AND the judge's copy of the notice of removal. Furthermore, your electronic filing of the voluminous state-court record is insufficient. Upon re-filing, each document of the state-court record must be separately identified by its title instead of merely being referred to as an "additional page(s)," so the Court and opposing parties can quickly jump to whichever document in the state-court record they desire to review. Failure to refile these documents as instructed by March 24, 2017, will result in remand. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 2/23/2017) (tln) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Center Street, Ltd., DS Family, L.P., Financial Worx, Ltd., Sekure Connect, Ltd., Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Financial Worx, Ltd. for Sekure Connect, Ltd.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Solutions Management, LLC for Financial Worx, Ltd.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate S Management, LLC for Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Blue Canyon Management, LLC for DS Family, L.P.. (Smythe, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Tue 02/21 8:53 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (tln) |
|
Att: 1 original petition | ||
9 | 9
qcref
Means
Tue 02/21 8:38 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Filing - State Records re:4 Notice (Other),,,2 Notice (Other),,,5 Notice (Other),,,6 Notice (Other),,,3 Notice (Other),,,7 Notice (Other),,,1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s) | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Filing - State Records re:4 Notice (Other),,,2 Notice (Other),,,5 Notice (Other),,,6 Notice (Other),,,3 Notice (Other),,,1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 26 Additional Page(s) | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 11:29 AM
NOTICE of filing - State Records re:4 Notice (Other),,,2 Notice (Other),,,5 Notice (Other),,,3 Notice (Other),,,1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 26 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 27 Additional Page(s) | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Filing - State Records re:2 Notice (Other),,,3 Notice (Other),,,1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 26 Additional Page(s) | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Filing - State Records re:2 Notice (Other),,,3 Notice (Other),,,1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 26 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 27 Additional Page(s) | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 10:56 AM
NOTICE of filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s) | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/20 10:47 AM
NOTICE of filed by Dan Simmons, Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 21 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 22 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 23 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 24 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 25 Additional Page(s) | ||
Sunday, February 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Sun 02/19 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 141st Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 141-255831-11 filed by Simmons & Associates of North Texas, PLLC, Dan Simmons. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8220841) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smythe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement |