Arrington v. Jackson National LIfe Insurance Company et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00472 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 19, 2017 5:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jackson National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William M Arrington
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Danny C Burba
Terminated: 08/07/2017
4404 Wesley Street
Amarillo, TX 79121 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
77 | 77
9
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 10/25 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting53 Motion for leave to Amend and to Remand. The case is remanded to the 298th District Court, Dallas County, for further proceedings. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/25/2018) (zkc) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 10/25 4:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated per77 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (zkc) |
||
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
75 | 75
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 10/19 5:18 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company re62 Response/Objection (Illmer, Richard) |
|
74 | 74
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 10/19 3:23 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by William M Arrington re53 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Remand (Simmons, Christopher) |