Garza et al v. International Grains and Cereal LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00476 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 19, 2017 3:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
International Grains and Cereal LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Garza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoc Van Luong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Rucha
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 08/08 12:52 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Fees and costs shall be borne by the party incurring same. THIS IS A FINAL ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/8/2018) (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/07 9:12 AM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 07/31 11:12 AM
ORDER granting21 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Extending Summary Judgment Motion Deadline. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/7/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/31/2018) (svc) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/30 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alif Rabby Mia on behalf of International Grains and Cereal LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mia, Alif) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 07/30 10:12 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Extending Summary Judgment Motion Deadline filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC, Jesus Garza, Hoc Van Luong, Arthur Rucha. (McAllister, Greg) Modified to added filers on 7/30/2018 (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Protective Order
Fri 06/29 11:16 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/29/2018) (ran) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Protective Order
Thu 06/28 2:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Summary
Tue 06/05 2:18 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Adam Greenfield, Greg McAllister and Alif Mia. Prv Fee: $ $3,000. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Lopez, Carlos) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 06/05 1:14 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: After reviewing the papers and pleadings on file, the Court notes that the parties were required to mediate this case on or before June 1, 2018.14 . The parties have not done so. Therefore, the Court ORDERS the following: By June 11, 2018, both parties must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why they have not yet attended mediation and/or filed an Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Summary. Failure to show cause or file the appropriate documents may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/5/2018) (chmb) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order For ADR
Mon 11/06 12:43 PM
MEDIATION ORDER.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The Court has selected Carlos Lopez as the parties' mediator. The parties should ensure that Carlos Lopez receives this Order. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/1/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/6/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
adr
Designation of Mediator
Wed 09/06 11:15 AM
Designation of Mediator by International Grains and Cereal LLC. (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/02 11:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for Court's four-week docket beginning 10/29/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2018. Motions due by 7/31/2018. Discovery due by 7/2/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/1/2018. Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 10/15/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/2/2017) (aaa) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/28 10:54 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC. (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Status Report Order
Wed 07/05 8:46 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/5/2017) (sss) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 07/05 8:24 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of Defendant's9 Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, the Court DENIES as moot Defendant's5 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/5/2017) (chmb) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/30 2:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McAllister, Greg) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/30 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint ,6 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 06/16 2:26 PM
RESPONSE filed by Jesus Garza, Hoc Van Luong, Arthur Rucha re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Greenfield, Adam) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/12 9:41 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Grains and Cereal LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Alimentos Polar, C.A. for International Grains and Cereal LLC. (McAllister, Greg) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 05/12 9:33 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by International Grains and Cereal LLC re5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint (McAllister, Greg) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/12 9:31 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by International Grains and Cereal LLCAttorney Greg Patrick McAllister added to party International Grains and Cereal LLC(pty:dft) (McAllister, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/21 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to International Grains and Cereal LLC. (twd) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Tue 02/21 2:51 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/20 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jesus Garza, Hoc Van Luong, Arthur Rucha. (Greenfield, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/20 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Hoc Van Luong, Jesus Garza, Arthur Rucha. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8221314) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Greenfield, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |