PULPHUS et al v. AYERS
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | John D Bates |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00310 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
STEPHEN T. AYERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM LACY CLAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID PULPHUS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 14 2017
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying 7 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/14/17. (lcjdb2) |
1. | Lawsuit filed over controversial painting portraying police officers as pigs (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/13 5:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS. (Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 07/25 2:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of28 the parties' joint motion for extension of time to continue ongoing settlement discussions, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for 10:15 a.m. on August 26, 2019. Should the parties settle the case before that date, the status conference will be vacated. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/25/2019. (lcjdb2) Modified on 7/25/2019 (lcjdb2) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 07/25 3:52 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 07/24 7:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's Order to Show Cause by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS (Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/27 9:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 7/24/2019. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 06/26 3:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of27 the parties' joint motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed by not later than July 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/26/2019. (lcjdb2) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 06/24 5:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS (Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/05 1:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 6/24/2019. (tb) |
||
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/04 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of26 the parties' joint motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed by not later than June 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/4/2019. (lcjdb2) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 06/03 6:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS (Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/23 10:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 6/4/2019. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 05/22 4:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS(Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Kymberly Evanson, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/22 6:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of25 the parties' joint motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that that the parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed by not later than June 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/22/2019. (lcjdb2) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/22 10:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 5/22/2019. (tb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 04/19 4:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's Order to Show Cause by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS(Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/19 5:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of24 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed by not later than May 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/19/2019. (lcjdb2) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/16 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 4/22/2019. (tb) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 04/15 5:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by not later than April 22, 2019, the parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed in light of the D.C. Circuit's decision in Pulphus v. Ayers, 909 F.3d 1148 (D.C. Cir. 2018). Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/15/2019. (lcjdb2) |
||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 01/28 5:38 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DAVID PULPHUS, WILLIAM LACY CLAY ; USCA Case Number 17-5095 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 06/19 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS. Attorney Leah J. Tulin terminated. (Tulin, Leah) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 05/05 7:04 PM
USCA Case Number 17-5095 for19 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DAVID PULPHUS, WILLIAM LACY CLAY. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 05/01 4:27 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re19 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/28 5:49 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by STEPHEN T. AYERS. (Hair, Christopher) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 04/28 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to16 Memorandum & Opinion,15 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Hearing by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4932545. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Tulin, Leah) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Transcript
Wed 04/26 1:55 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates, held on March 15, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-75. Date of Issuance: 4/26/2017. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017.(Wayne, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 7:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by STEPHEN T. AYERS.(Hair, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/17 10:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2017. (tb) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 04/14 12:32 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying7 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/14/17. (lcjdb2) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Hearing
Fri 04/14 12:28 PM
ORDER denying7 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction; terminating7 motion for hearing. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/14/17. (lcjdb2) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/07 6:26 PM
NOTICE to Court by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS (Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 03/15 4:46 PM
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by DAVID PULPHUS, WILLIAM LACY CLAY; Preliminary Injunction Motion heard and taken under. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 03/10 9:50 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by WILLIAM LACY CLAY.(Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/09 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erwin Chemerinsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chemerinsky, Erwin) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 03/06 11:21 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by STEPHEN T. AYERS.(Braswell, Marina) |
|
Att: 1 Ayers Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Cohen Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Wolanin Declaration | ||
order
.Order
Mon 03/06 5:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of5 and6 the motions for leave to appear pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Laurence H. Tribe and James M. Williams are admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/6/17. (lcjdb2) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/02 12:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response to PI moiton due by 3/6/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 3/10/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 03/01 4:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the telephone conference held on this date, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction shall be filed by not later than March 6, 2017; and plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by not later than March 10, 2017. A hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction is set for March 15, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 30. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/1/17. (lcjdb2) |
||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 03/02 12:25 PM
Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: See Minute Order previously entered. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/28 2:55 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference in Courtroom 30A set for 3/1/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb) |
||
order
.Order
Tue 02/28 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the entire record in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference to discuss scheduling in this case is set for March 1, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/28/17. (lcjdb2) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/28 8:54 AM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge John D. Bates. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/27 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of STEPHEN T. AYERS (Hair, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/27 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of STEPHEN T. AYERS (Braswell, Marina) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 02/24 9:28 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS(Tulin, Leah) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David Pulphus, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Pulphus Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of William Lacy Clay, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit G to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit H to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit I to Clay Declaration, | ||
Att: 15 Declaration of Kymberly K. Evanson, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit A to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit B to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit C to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit D to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit E to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit F to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit G to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit H to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit I to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit J to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit K to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit L to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit M to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit N to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit O to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit P to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit Q to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit R to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit S to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit T to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit U to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit V to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit W to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit X to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit Y to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit Z to Evanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 42 Declaration of Dr. Thomas Ringenberg, | ||
Att: 43 Declaration of Yvette Cravins, | ||
Att: 44 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/24 9:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James M. Williams, :Firm- Chehardy, Sherman, Williams, Murray, Recile, Stakelum, & Hayes, LLP, :Address- One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1100, Metairie, Louisiana 70001. Phone No. - (504) 833-5600. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4855048. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS(Tulin, Leah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of James M. Williams, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/24 9:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laurence H. Tribe, :Address- Hauser Hall 420, Harvard University, Cambridge, MA 02138. Phone No. - (617) 495-1767. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4855047. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIAM LACY CLAY, DAVID PULPHUS(Tulin, Leah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Laurence H. Tribe, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/24 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leah J. Tulin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tulin, Leah) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
.Order
Wed 02/22 10:55 AM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/22/2017. (lckbj1) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 02/21 11:37 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to STEPHEN T. AYERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against STEPHEN T. AYERS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4848872) filed by DAVID PULPHUS, WILLIAM LACY CLAY.(Evanson, Kymberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/21 11:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) |