Gundin v. TerraForm Global, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00516 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:5851 Discrimination "Whistle blower" Employee - ERA (employee protection) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Peter Blackmore
50 Barry Lane
Atherton, CA 94027 |
|
Defendant
Ahmad Chatila
24931 Prospect Avenue
Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 |
|
Defendant
Emmanuel Hernandez
3467 Malibu Terrace
Fremont, CA 94539 |
|
Defendant
TerraForm Power, Inc.
7550 Wisconsin Ave. 9th Floor
Bethesda, MD 20814 |
|
Defendant
Brian Wuebbels
11663 OSanna Lane
Highland, IL 62249 |
|
Defendant
TerraForm Global, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Martin Truong
|
|
Plaintiff
Francisco J. Perez Gundin
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former SunEdison Executives File Whistleblower Lawsuits (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 02/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
MDL Certified Transfer Order
Tue 04/18 1:52 PM
MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/18/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Remark
Tue 04/18 1:54 PM
Case Electronically Transferred to USDC for the Southern District of New York. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/23 2:12 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Peter Blackmore, Ahmad Chatila, Emmanuel Hernandez, TerraForm Global, Inc., TerraForm Power, Inc., Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels.(kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/23 1:42 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 6:47 PM
NOTICE by Francisco Perez Gundin re1 Complaint Signed civil action cover sheet (Woodfield, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 6:20 PM
NOTICE by Francisco Perez Gundin re1 Complaint For clerk to issue summons(Woodfield, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 For clerk to issue summons, | ||
Att: 2 For clerk to issue summons, | ||
Att: 3 For clerk to issue summons, | ||
Att: 4 For clerk to issue summonsv, | ||
Att: 5 For clerk to issue summons, | ||
Att: 6 For clerk to issue summons | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 5:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6511785.), filed by Francisco Perez Gundin.(Woodfield, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Attachment A to civil cover sheet |