Hansen v. Arkansas State Medical Board et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
William F Dudding
|
|
Defendant
John B Weiss
|
|
Defendant
Sylvia D Simon
|
|
Defendant
John H Scribner
|
|
Defendant
Scott Pace
|
|
Defendant
Larry D Lovell
|
|
Defendant
Veryl D Hodges
|
|
Defendant
John E Hearnsberger, II
|
|
Defendant
Peggy Cryer
|
|
Defendant
Bob Cogburn
|
|
Defendant
Jim Citty
|
|
Defendant
Steven L Cathey
|
|
Defendant
Harold B Betton
|
|
Defendant
Joseph M Beck
|
|
Defendant
Omar Atiq
|
|
Defendant
Arkansas State Medical Board
|
|
Plaintiff
Terry Leonid Hansen
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Roger Harmon
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |