Keller v. USA et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Billy Roy Wilson |
Referred: | Beth Deere |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Copies
Tue 03/21 2:29 PM
REQUEST for Copies and NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Daniel E Keller. (thd) (Docket text modified on 3/21/2017 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 03/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel E Keller. (thd) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Wed 02/22 2:01 PM
E-MAIL received from the U.S. District Court Northern District of Texas confirming the case was received and opened in their Court as case number 2:17-cv-00040. (jak) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Wed 02/22 10:47 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case immediately to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Division. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/22/2017. (rhm) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Wed 02/22 10:50 AM
Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Division. (rhm) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel E Keller.(kdr) |