Travis v. Kelley
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Webber Wright |
Referred: | J Thomas Ray |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00044 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Defendant
Wendy Kelley
|
|
Plaintiff
Tristan R Travis
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Ruling
Fri 11/15 2:52 PM
ORDER denying43 Petitioner's motion for additional findings. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/15/2019. (jbh) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Ruling
Fri 11/01 11:38 AM
MOTION for Additional Rulings by Tristan R Travis. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 10/17 9:12 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot40 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/2019. (hml) |
|
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Thu 10/17 8:39 AM
ORDER denying37 Petitioner's motion for additional findings; and denying38 motion to alter the judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/2019. (jbh) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 08/26 1:53 PM
MOTION for Status Update by Tristan R Travis. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/30 12:17 PM
NOTICE to the Court re37 and38 motions by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Alter Judgment
Tue 04/30 12:09 PM
MOTION to Alter26 Judgment by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
37 | 37
2
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 04/30 12:01 PM
MOTION for Amended or Additional Findings by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Relief
Fri 03/29 11:13 AM
ORDER denying35 Petitioner's motion for relief. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/2019. (cmn) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Relief
Mon 03/11 4:49 PM
MOTION for Relief under Rule 60(b) by Tristan R Travis. (llg) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/21 3:32 PM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 04/13/2018, as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis. (mcz) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 05/16 2:50 PM
ORDER of USCA as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis: The petition for rehearing by the panel is denied. (mcz) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 04/13 3:31 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis: The application for a certificate of appealability is denied. The appeal is dismissed. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. (mcz) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 11/13 3:23 PM
ORDER of USCA: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis. (cmn) |
|
30 | 30
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 11/13 3:22 PM
ORDER of USCA as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (cmn) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Docketing Letter
Mon 11/13 2:56 PM
USCA Docketing Letter as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis. USCA Case Number 17-3471 (cmn) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Tue 11/07 10:57 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by Tristan R Travis re25 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and26 Judgment. (cmn) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 11/07 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Tristan R Travis as to25 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and26 Judgment. (cmn) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Wed 09/27 4:26 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the25 Order, this habeas action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/2017. (cmn) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 09/27 4:23 PM
ORDER adopting the Recommendation as the Court's findings in all respects; denying Tristan Travis's petition for a writ of habeas corpus; and dismissing this case with prejudice. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/2017. (cmn) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 09/20 10:56 AM
OBJECTION to23 Recommended Disposition by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 09/05 4:18 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed with prejudice; further recommending that a Certificate of Appealability be denied pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/5/17. (tjb) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/21 12:30 PM
ORDER granting Petitioner's17 Motion to Extend Time; and denying Petitioner's18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court concludes that the Reply Brief filed by Travis on 7/19/2017 should be deemed to be timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/21/2017. (ljb) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/19 11:50 AM
NOTICE re20 Reply by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
20 | 20
respoth
Reply (Non Motion)
Wed 07/19 11:48 AM
REPLY to14 Response to Habeas Petition by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/14 12:20 PM
NOTICE by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/12 1:40 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time
Wed 07/12 1:39 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Addendum
Wed 06/14 9:48 AM
ADDENDUM to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Mon 06/12 10:55 AM
ORDER directing Travis to file, on or before 7/14/2017, a Reply addressing14 Respondent's arguments for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/12/2017. (kdr) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Fri 06/09 10:54 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley.(Rumpz, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Judgment and Commitment Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Argument Portion of Petitioner's Brief on Direct Appeal | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Consent Notice
Wed 05/24 10:38 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Rumpz on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Rumpz, Pamela) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Directing Service (State Habeas)
Wed 05/17 10:40 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of1 § 2254 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by mail; and directing the Respondent to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/17/2017. (kdr) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 04/19 11:13 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number LIT061492. (alm) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Fri 04/14 11:13 AM
ORDER denying Tristan Travis's6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. If Travis wishes to continue with this habeas action, he must pay the $5 filing fee, in full, on or before 5/15/2017. Service of the Petition is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/14/2017. (ljb) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response (Non Motion)
Mon 03/20 3:30 PM
RESPONSE to5 Order by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 03/20 3:22 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tristan R Travis. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 02/28 2:16 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Travis a copy of4 the Addendum filed with the Court; directing Travis to, if he wishes to pursue the habeas claims contained in the4 Addendum to his 2254 Petition, on or before 4/3/2017, sign and file a document stating that the claims asserted in the Addendum are true and correct and that they represent additional claims he intended to assert as part of his original habeas petition; directing the Clerk to send Travis an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; and directing Travis to either: (a) file the fully completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, including a Certificate of Prisoner Accounts signed by an authorized officer of the Cummins Unit; or (b) submit a check or money order covering the $5 filing fee in full, in order to continue with this action. He must complete one of these options on or before 4/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/28/2017. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Addendum
Wed 02/22 11:30 AM
ADDENDUM to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tristan R Travis. (mef) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/22 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Power of Attorney by Tristan R Travis. (mef) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/22 11:27 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Tristan R Travis. (mef) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 02/21 2:09 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tristan R Travis.(mef) |