Slay v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Lou Robinson |
Referred: | Clinton E Averitte |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00036 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Petitioner
Roderick Slay
|
|
Respondent
Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied
Tue 05/16 3:14 PM
ORDER DENYING ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/16/2017) (awc) |
|
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Tue 05/16 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT -- Of equal date herewith, the undersigned United States District Judge has entered an Order adopting the Report and Recommendation issued by the United States Magistrate Judge, and dismissing petitioner's application for a federal writ of habeas corpus. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/16/2017) (awc) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 05/16 3:11 PM
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS, ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, DISMISSING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS and IMPOSING SANCTIONS re:9 Report and Recommendation. The objections filed by petitioner are hereby OVERRULED, and the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED. Additionally, petitioner is prohibited from filing any future lawsuits or habeas corpus petitions unless granted leave to do so by a federal judicial officer. Any motion for leave to file a lawsuit or habeas corpus petition is denied if leave to file is not granted within fourteen (14) days of the date of filing the motion for leave. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/16/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 05/16 3:22 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12,13. Tue May 16 15:22:45 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Mon 05/08 2:13 PM
OBJECTION to9 Report and Recommendation by Roderick Slay. (awc) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Findings and Recommendations ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Thu 04/27 1:36 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re:3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 4/27/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/27 1:36 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Apr 27 13:36:37 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 04/24 3:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by Roderick Slay re:5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. (awc) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 5:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TIME EXTENSION - Petitioner's motion is GRANTED to the extent that he shall file his response within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. re:6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 4/12/2017) (vls) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/12 5:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Apr 12 17:05:02 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/10 2:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED filed by Roderick Slay. (awc) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Mon 03/20 3:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED -- Petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this Order to show cause why the filing of his Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody in this cause number is not sanctionable under Rule 11 (b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 3/20/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/20 3:26 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Mar 20 15:26:32 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 02/21 4:11 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Roderick Slay re3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (vls) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 02/21 4:10 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roderick Slay. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (vls) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/21 4:09 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (vls) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Robinson
Tue 02/21 4:08 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Averitte preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Averitte. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 4:11 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of 1st page of file marked petition also mailed to petitioner) Tue Feb 21 16:11:45 CST 2017 (crt) |