Slay v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Lou Robinson |
Referred: | Clinton E Averitte |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2017 |
Petitioner
Roderick Slay
|
|
Respondent
Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 05/15 3:41 PM
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS: The undersigned has again made a de novo review and an independent examination of the record in this case, carefully examining the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as well as petitioner's objections. After careful consideration, petitioner's objections are OVERRULED as untimely. Alternatively, the objections are overruled on the merits. The previous Order adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and dismissing the petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by petitioner remains in effect, as does the Judgment entered in accordance therewith. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/15/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/15 3:42 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Mon May 15 15:42:27 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied
Tue 05/09 3:38 PM
ORDER DENYING ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/9/2017) (awc) |
|
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Tue 05/09 3:34 PM
JUDGMENT -- Of equal date herewith, the undersigned United States District Judge has entered an Order adopting the Report and Recommendation issued by the United States Magistrate Judge, and dismissing petitioner's application for a federal writ of habeas corpus. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/9/2017) (awc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 05/09 3:32 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and DISMISSING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re:8 Report and Recommendation (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/9/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 05/09 3:38 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10,11,12. Tue May 9 15:38:43 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Mon 05/08 1:54 PM
OBJECTION to8 Report and Recommendation by Roderick Slay. (awc) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Findings and Recommendations ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Thu 04/13 10:04 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re:3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 4/13/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/13 10:04 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Apr 13 10:04:31 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 4:32 PM
ORDER Denying6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. No Order to Show Cause has been issued in this case and petitioner's motion is DENIED asunnecessary. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 4/12/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/12 4:32 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Apr 12 16:32:46 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/10 2:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED filed by Roderick Slay. (awc) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Wed 03/15 9:46 AM
ORDER TEMPORARILY GRANTING PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PENDING SUPPLEMENTATION -- Petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the entry of this Order in which to submit the request and data sheet, pay the filing fee, or submit evidence that petitioner has authorized the institution to disburse the requisite funds from his trust account. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte on 3/15/2017) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/15 9:47 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Mar 15 09:47:35 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 02/21 4:27 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Roderick Slay re3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (vls) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 02/21 4:26 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roderick Slay. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (vls) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/21/2017) (vls) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/21 4:25 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (vls) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Robinson
Tue 02/21 4:25 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Averitte preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Averitte. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 4:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of 1st page of file marked petition also mailed to petitioner) Tue Feb 21 16:27:58 CST 2017 (crt) |