Bayne v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00478 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
DOES 1-10, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Cary Gresham Bayne
3410 Trumbull Street
San Diego, CA 92106 |
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Mon 08/08 4:14 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified that this case has settled. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers as soon as the settlement is fully consummated. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/8/2022) (chmb) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/08 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint Notice) filed by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Case List | ||
Monday, July 11, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 07/11 12:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within thirty (30) days why their case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Case Management Order No. 12 ("CMO 12") [Dkt. 1054], because Defendant's Lead Counsel notified the Special Master that, after having been provided the requisite notice and 30 days to cure, Plaintiff has failed to fully comply with the requirements of CMO 12. Failure to comply with this Order will result in DISMISSAL of this case WITHOUT prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/11/2022) (chmb) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 05/27 3:27 PM
|
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/20 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master James M. Stanton: Status Conference held on 7/12/2021. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via teleconference and advised the court that the parties have not reached a settlement. Pursuant to CMO 13 [Doc. 1150], the parties are directed to attend mediation within 120 days of this order \ to be scheduled via email correspondence. (James M. Stanton Special Master). (twd) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 10/23 6:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. After reviewing the Response, the Court finds that Plaintiffs'4 Motion to Withdraw is DENIED as moot, and Defendants'5 Motion to Dismiss, is also DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/23/2020) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 10/22 12:11 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cary Gresham Bayne re:5 MOTION to Dismiss (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/29 11:12 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 07/28 3:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph A. Osborne filed by Cary Gresham Bayne with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 10:33 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cary Gresham Bayne. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Cary Gresham Bayne. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8222444) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |