Thompson v. USA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Consolidating Cases
Wed 03/29 4:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Cause Nos. 3:17-cv-00487-G-BK and 3:16cv1725 G-BK are CONSOLIDATED. Henceforth all pleadings will be filed in No. 3:16cv1725 G-BK. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/29/2017) (ali) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel Hearing
Tue 02/21 2:49 PM
MOTION for Evedentiary Hearing and MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher Thompson. (epm) |
|
3 | 3
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 02/21 2:47 PM
Memorandum in Support filed by Christopher Thompson re2 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Tue 02/21 2:45 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:03cr382) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/21 2:44 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 2:49 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1. Tue Feb 21 14:49:53 CST 2017 (crt) |