Andino et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
DOES 1-10 inclusive
|
|
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enrique Andino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Andino
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/04 4:58 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by George Smith, Shirley Smith, Alan Borders, James Green, Yvette Green, Debra Wilk, Thomas Beverly, Jeanne Purves, Michael Wheeler, Sylvia Watson, Enrique Andino, Sandra Andino, Richard Knox Looper, Jr, Ben Spurlock, Sheila Spurlock, Sharline Johnson, Allen Brandenburg, Mabel Brandenburg, John Patrick Lowe, Rhonda Chew, Christy Wilson, Gary Lindsey, Joan Lindsey. (Hymes, William) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Fri 03/04 5:04 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/28 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William E Hymes on behalf of Enrique Andino, Sandra Andino. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hymes, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/11 10:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy International Limited. Waiver sent on 2/22/2017; DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Waiver sent on 2/22/2017; DePuy Products Inc. Waiver sent on 2/22/2017; Johnson & Johnson Inc. Waiver sent on 2/22/2017; Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Waiver sent on 2/22/2017. (Hymes, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Enrique Andino, Sandra Andino (Hymes, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enrique Andino, Sandra Andino. (Hymes, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Sandra Andino, Enrique Andino. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8224426) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hymes, William) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |