Anfinson v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00490 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
One Johnson & Johnson Plaza
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1-10 inclusive
|
|
Plaintiff
Roger Anfinson
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Thu 05/26 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified by the Special Master-James Stanton that counsel for the parties have confirmed to him that this case has settled. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers as soon as the settlement is fully consummated. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/26/2022) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Transferring to Another Division
Tue 02/21 3:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Transferring case to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas to be considered a tag-along action in the DePuy Pinnacle MDL - 3:11-MD-2244. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/21/2017) (chmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Roger Anfinson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8223298) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McEwen, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Related Case | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/21 3:22 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Ed Kinkeade pursuant to Amended SO 3-250. Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost no longer assigned to the case. (chmb) |
||
utility
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Tue 02/21 3:58 PM
New case number 3:17-cv-00490-K Anfinson v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 1:17cv0024 K. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm) |