Morgan v. Parc Plaza Development LP et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00492 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Parc Plaza Development LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Park Fountains LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/27 8:53 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Jason Morgan. (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Tue 03/27 10:03 AM
Civil Case Terminated per33 Stipulation of Dismissal. (epm) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/02 10:25 AM
ORDER: The parties having advised the court that this case has been settled, it is ORDERED that the final judgment or order of dismissal be presented for entry by April 2, 2018. If it is not, then the case will be subject to dismissal. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/2/2018) (lag/chmb) |
|
31 | 31
adr
ADR Summary
Fri 03/02 8:33 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Eric Calhoun, Richard Hunt. Prv Fee: $ $2650.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Prevost, J) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/28 10:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to27 MOTION Reverse Magistrate's Order re26 Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Jason Morgan (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 02/12 1:45 PM
Designation of Experts by Jason Morgan. (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 02/12 10:04 AM
Designation of Experts by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Sunday, February 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Sun 02/11 8:23 PM
MOTION Reverse Magistrate's Order re26 Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) List of Morgan Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 02/08 3:30 PM
ORDER denying15 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Property Inspection. Defendants are ORDERED to provide to Plaintiff and/or his experts, by 3/12/2018, the requested access to the Property for purposes of inspection. Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees is also DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/8/2018) (ykp) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/19 2:52 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time re Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Jason Morgan (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order For ADR
Fri 01/05 1:13 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints J Neal Prevost as mediator. Within the next 30 days, the parties shall agree with the mediator on a date on which the mediation can be held. If no agreed date can be scheduled, then the mediator shall, within the next 30 days, select a date and all parties shall appear as directed by the mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/5/2018) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 01/02 10:21 PM
RESPONSE filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP re:15 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Property Inspection ,22 Supplemental Document, (Hunt, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 01/02 12:55 PM
Supplemental Document by Jason Morgan as to21 Sur-reply . (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - 11-30-17 Memo Adopting Magistrate's Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - 08-11-17 Magistrate's Report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - 11-12-17 Magistrate's Report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D - 12-29-17 Memo Adopting Magistrate's Report | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Sur-reply
Tue 10/31 12:45 PM
Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply in Support of15 Motion for Protective Order. (ams) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 10/31 11:26 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order . The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to docket [19-1] the attached sur-reply as Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/31/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File
Mon 10/30 2:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply in Support of15 Motion for Protective Order filed by Jason Morgan (Calhoun, Eric) Docket text modified on 10/30/2017 (twd). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Sur-Reply to Defs' Reply re Inspection and Motion for Protective Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, October 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply
Sun 10/15 10:12 AM
REPLY filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP re:15 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Property Inspection (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) HR Rep 100-711 | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 10/13 2:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Jason Morgan re:15 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Property Inspection (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Email June 21, 2017, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Pltf's Req for Entry Upon Premises, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Email Sept. 15, 2017, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Tue 09/26 10:42 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE: Defendants' motion for protective order (docket entry15 ) is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for a hearing, if necessary, and for determination. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/26/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Mon 09/25 11:43 AM
MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Property Inspection filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Request for Inspection | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/30 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Jason Morgan (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 1:44 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for Court's four-week docket beginning 9/4/2018 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2017. Motions due by 2/23/2018. Discovery due by 4/30/2018. Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/24/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2018 10:00 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/29/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/23 1:27 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Jason Morgan. (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
Mon 06/05 9:58 AM
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in9 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Status Report Order
Fri 06/02 2:52 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/23/2017. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/2/2017) (chmb) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/02 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/02 1:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Richard M Hunt added to party Parc Plaza Development LP(pty:dft), Attorney Richard M Hunt added to party Park Fountains LP(pty:dft) (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/18 4:30 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Parc Plaza Development LP answer due 6/2/2017; Park Fountains LP answer due 6/2/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/18/2017) (epm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/18 3:28 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP (Carlton, Jerry) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/18 10:27 AM
STIPULATION Regarding Answer by Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. (Carlton, Jerry) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/22 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Parc Plaza Development LP, Park Fountains LP. (epm) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Fish
Wed 02/22 9:42 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 4:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason Morgan. (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jason Morgan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8224740) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Calhoun, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |