Hill v. Watkins et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00494 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Terri Moore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joy Waller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ivan Irwin, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robin Harrison
|
|
Defendant
John Dagley
|
|
Defendant
Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP
4000 Two Houston Center 909 Fannin Street
Houston, TX 77010 |
|
Defendant
Justin Campbell
|
|
Defendant
Alinda Wilkert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Craig Watkins
133 N. Industrial Blvd. LB 19
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Tillotson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Randall Thompson
|
|
Defendant
Donna Strittmatter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Edith Santos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Picket
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ty Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen Malouf
Law Offices of Stephen Malouf 3811 Turtle Creek Blvd Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75219 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hoyt Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lyda Hill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albert G Hill, Jr
4712 Lakeside Dr
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mo Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Branch Bankting & Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Blue Baron
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charla Aldous
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albert Hill Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert G Hill, III
981 Davis Drive NW
Atlanta, GA 30327 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/27 12:32 PM
***DISREGARD - clerical error***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:31. NEF of 27,28,32 Fri Jul 27 12:32:51 CDT 2018 (crt) Modified on 7/27/2018 (sss) |
||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
154 | 154
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 07/26 8:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot150 Motion for Attorney's Fees, as Branch Banking & Trust has filed a notice withdrawing the motion (see Doc. 153). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/26/2018) (chmb) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 07/26 9:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of 154 Thu Jul 26 09:31:32 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
153 | 153
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/25 7:14 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re:150 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company (Gaither, Catherine) |