Prelow v. Town of Pantego, Texas et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00162 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 3:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sergeant Benjamin Moore
|
|
Defendant
Town of Pantego Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerald Dwayne Prelow
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Mon 07/10 4:59 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to vacate10 is hereby DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/10/2017) (skg) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 04/13 10:17 AM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Town of Pantego Texas re:10 MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal and to Reinstate Dismissed Case (Barrett, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Vacate
Thu 04/06 4:10 PM
MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal and to Reinstate Dismissed Case filed by Jerald Dwayne Prelow with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shelby, Tracie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 03/29 11:26 AM
Order. Pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and in accordance with the Courts March 28, 2017 Order dismissing this action (ECF No. 8), it ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/29/2017) (trt) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 03/28 10:33 AM
ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Court's orders and prosecute his case, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/28/2017) (baa) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 03/23 9:28 AM
ORDER: The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to file a pleading explaining why he failed to follow the Court's February 22, 2017 Order requiring Plaintiff to attend a scheduling conference with Defendant and file a report for contents of a scheduling order. Plaintiff must file this pleading no later than March 27, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/23/2017) (skg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/14 1:15 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Town of Pantego Texas. (Barrett, Daniel) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 11:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Town of Pantego Texas. (Barrett, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Wed 02/22 10:31 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Wed 02/22 9:52 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before March 22, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/22/2017) (skg) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Amended Document
Tue 02/21 3:22 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Pantego Town of. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal,,,,,. Amended Civil Cover Sheet and Amended Supplemental Cover Sheet . (Dierker, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Supplement | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 02/21 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 348th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 348-288922-16 filed by Pantego Town of, Benjamin Moore. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8223762) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dierker, Ashley) Modified on 2/21/2017 (wxc) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet (See amended document | ||
Att: 2 ), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement (See amended document | ||
Att: 2 ), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s) |