Lee v. Lubbock Police Department et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00036 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 01/10 4:05 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. The appeal is dismissed as of January 10, 2018 for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay the fee. (zzm) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/19 9:22 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The applicant is barred from proceeding in forma pauperis on appeal because of the"three strikes" rules of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3), the Court certifiesthat the appeal is not taken in good faith for the reasons stated in the Order of dismissal entered March 13, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/19/2017) (bmg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 12/19 9:23 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Tue Dec 19 09:23:24 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 12/18 4:39 PM
USCA Case Number 17-11471 in USCA FIFTH CIRCUIT for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. (bmg) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 12/13 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Judgment,8 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous, to the Fifth Circuit by Timothy Patrick Lee. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (krd) Modified text on 12/13/2017 (bmg) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 12/13 1:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. (krd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 12/13 2:13 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Mailed Copy of NEF Wed Dec 13 14:13:53 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 10/02 3:01 PM
ORDER of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of October 2, 2017, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay $505.00 filing fee. (zzm) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/14 11:24 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order: PLAINTIFF IS CAUTIONED that if he files any further frivolous motions in this case, or in anyother case pending before this Court, sanctions will be imposed against him. Such sanctions may include monetary sanctions or a complete bar to filing pleadings without leave of the Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/14/2017) (bmg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 09/14 11:25 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Thu Sep 14 11:25:01 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/13 10:30 AM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order re8 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous9 Judgment filed by Timothy Patrick Lee (bmg) Modified on 9/13/2017 (bmg) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 08/23 8:39 AM
USCA Case Number 17-10912 in USCA FIFTH CIRCUIT for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. (zzm) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 08/18 1:44 PM
APPELLATE FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: Timothy Patrick Lee must address the following deficiency: Pay the appeal fee of $505.00 or file a signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, A Certified Copy of his inmate trust account statement, A signed copy of the Authorization portion of the Certificate of Inmate Trust Account, and file a Response to bring Appellant's Notice of Appeal into compliance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure. Deadline to cure the deficiency is 20 days. Failure to file the required documents will result in a denial of in forma pauperis status without further notice. The Clerk mailed to Appellant a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization along with a copy of this Order and copies of docket sheets in Civil Action Nos. 5:17-CV-036-C and 5:17-CV-037-C. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/18/2017) (zzm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 08/18 1:45 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. The Clerk mailed to Appellant a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization along with a copy of this Order and copies of docket sheets in Civil Action Nos. 5:17-CV-036-C and 5:17-CV-037-C. Fri Aug 18 13:45:29 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 08/14 11:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Mon Aug 14 11:48:32 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 08/14 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Judgment,, Super U,8 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous,,, to the Fifth Circuit by Timothy Patrick Lee. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (zzm) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment ~Util Super U
Mon 03/13 11:00 AM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's Order of even date,It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's civil rights complaint isdismissed with prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Set Strike Flag. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (zzm) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous
Mon 03/13 10:55 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS: Plaintiff's complaint and all claims alleged therein are dismissed with prejudice as frivolous and for failure to state a claim. This dismissal shall count as a qualifying dismissal under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915 and 1915A, 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, and Adepegba v. Hammons, 103 F.3d 383 (5th Cir. 1996). Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Any pending motions are denied. PLAINTIFF IS CAUTIONED that if he continues to file frivolous complaints, motions, or other documents, sanctions will be imposed against him. Such sanctions may include monetary sanctions, the dismissal of a complaint with prejudice, and/or a complete bar to filing pleadings without leave of the Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (zzm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/13 11:07 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Mon Mar 13 11:07:37 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Full Payment
Thu 03/09 11:01 AM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Timothy Patrick Lee shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/9/2017) (bdg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/09 11:02 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Also mailed a copy of Order to Gaines County Jail - Inmate Accounting Office Thu Mar 9 11:02:26 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 03/07 2:18 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Patrick Lee re1 Complaint. (zzm) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/06 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Timothy Patrick Lee (cb) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 02/24 9:37 AM
FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: Timothy Patrick Lee must address the following deficiency: Pay the $400.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; a certified copy of his certificate of inmate trust account and a signed copy of the authorization portion of the certificate of inmate trust account. Deadline to cure the deficiency is twenty (20) days. Failure to file the required document will result in a denial of in forma pauperis status and a dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint for want of prosecution without further notice, unless the filing fee of $400.00 is timely paid. The Clerk shall mail and Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/24/2017) (bdg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/24 9:37 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Also mailed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization forms along with order. Fri Feb 24 09:37:36 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/21 3:35 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (zzm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Tue 02/21 3:35 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zzm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 3:37 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Tue Feb 21 15:37:11 CST 2017 (crt) |