Brooks v. Wainwright et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00015 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Mon 01/06 5:00 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/6/2020) (skg) |
|
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Mon 01/06 4:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/6/2020) (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 01/06 5:00 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18, 19. Mon Jan 6 17:00:49 CST 2020 (crt) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/14 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Vernon E Brooks. New address: Ellis Unit, 1697 Fm 980, Huntsville, Texas 77343. (trt) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/21 12:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Vernon E Brooks re:15 District Court's Questionnaire. (plp) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judge's Questionnaire
Wed 04/05 11:54 AM
DISTRICT COURT'S QUESTIONNAIRE TO PLAINTIFF sent to Plaintiff Vernon E. Brooks. Plaintiff shall sign the verification certificate under penalty of perjury, and return the answers to questions to the Clerk of this Court by April 25, 2017. Failure to file answers to the Court's questions could result in dismissal of the case without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/5/2017) (baa) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/05 10:37 AM
ORDER denying12 Plaintiff's second motion for the Court to declare the inmate filing fee assessment and collection provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915 unconstitutional. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/5/2017) (baa) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order For Partial Filing Fee
Wed 04/05 10:32 AM
FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall, when funds exist in plaintiff's inmate trust account or institutional equivalent, forward to the Court an initial partial filing fee of $109.00. Plaintiff shall pay $241.00, the balance of the filing fee, in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/5/2017) (baa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/05 10:38 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13,14. Wed Apr 5 10:38:09 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/05 11:55 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Wed Apr 5 11:55:24 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/28 4:45 PM
"Motion for Rehearing on Declaratory Judgment of Trust Fund Statute, and Asking the Court to Rule on Specific Issue's Presented in Prior Motions," filed by Vernon E Brooks. (baa) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/28 4:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account, filed by Vernon E Brooks. (baa) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Remark
Fri 03/24 3:41 PM
Correspondence to the Court with Proposed Summons for all Defendants, filed by Vernon E Brooks. (baa) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/10 8:20 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Fri Mar 10 08:20:48 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/10 8:20 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to declare the inmate filing fee assessment and collection provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915 unconstitutional4 is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to waive his filing fees5 is DENIED. On or before March 29, 2017, Plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis which will result in a total fee payment of $350.00 assessed as required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b). Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/9/2017) (baa) |
|
utility
Modify Hearings/Deadlines
Mon 03/13 8:45 AM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set per Order9 . Responses due by 3/29/2017. (skg) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Trust Account
Fri 02/24 3:10 PM
Certificate of Trust Account by Vernon E Brooks TDCJ # 02045568. (baa) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Tue 02/21 11:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Gerald W. Brooks in support of Motion5 . (skg) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Tue 02/21 11:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Landry in Support of MOTION5 . (skg) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/21 11:42 AM
MOTION "for Waiver of Filing Fees due to Being a Totally Destitute Indigent and the Substantive Fundamental Interest at Stake" filed by Vernon E Brooks. (skg) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/21 11:39 AM
MOTION " to Declare the Prisoner's Trust Fund Withdrawal Statutes...Unconstitutional" filed by Vernon E Brooks (skg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/21 11:37 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (skg) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Tue 02/21 11:36 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/21 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Vernon E Brooks. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 11:37 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Tue Feb 21 11:37:42 CST 2017 (crt) |