Glenn v. Vendor Resource Management et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Referred: | Hal R Ray, Jr |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00016 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 12:191 Bank Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherrie Glenn
4715 Taft Blvd.
Wichita Falls, TX 76308 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Vendor Resource Management
Terminated: 04/26/2017
Gray c/o Jack O'Boyle & Associates P.O. Box 815369 Dallas
Dallas, TX 75381 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/12 7:49 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of DIsmissal with Prejudice | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Fri 01/12 8:20 AM
Civil Case Terminated per Joint Stipulation of Dismissal24 . (skg) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 01/05 3:04 PM
Appendix in Support filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA re22 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) App. 001 - App. 111 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 01/05 3:03 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Attachment re unpublished opinions cited in brief and prior version of 12 C.F.R. 1024.41 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/05 3:00 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 10/19 11:44 AM
ORDER granting19 Joint Motion to Extend Remaining Pre-Trial Deadlines. The Court entered a Scheduling Order in this case on March 14, 2017. ECF No.11 . It is amended as follows. The deadline for challenges to experts, found in the Scheduling Order at II.(3)(d), is extended to January 5, 2018. The deadline for dispositive motions, found in the Scheduling Order at II.(4), is extended to January 5, 2018. The deadline for mediation, found in the Scheduling Order at II.(5), is extended to December 22, 2017. Except as so provided, the other deadlines and provisions contained in the Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/19/2017) (plp) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 10/19 8:01 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Remaining Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
trial
Designation of Experts
Wed 08/16 5:18 PM
Designation of Experts by Sherrie Glenn. (Gossom, David) |
|
17 | 17
trial
Designation of Experts
Wed 08/16 4:54 PM
Designation of Experts by Sherrie Glenn. (Gossom, David) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
16 | 16
trial
Designation of Experts
Wed 08/16 10:50 AM
Designation of Experts by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 04/26 10:16 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court reviewed the proposed findings, conclusions, and recommendation for plain error. Finding none, the Court is of the opinion that the Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and they are accepted as the Findings and Conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Vendor Resource Management's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.6 ) is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Vendor Resource Management are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/26/2017) (skg) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 04/07 2:46 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Because Plaintiff has not alleged a legally valid cause of action against VRM, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge O'Connor GRANT Defendant Vendor Resource Management's Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim (ECF No.6 ) and DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against VRM with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/7/2017) (plp) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/27 11:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lewis, Wm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 03/20 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcie L Schout on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Tue 03/14 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2017. Discovery due by 10/16/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2017. Motions due by 11/1/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/1/2017. See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/14/2017) (plp) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/10 3:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Schout, Marcie) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 03/09 10:34 AM
ORDER granting8 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline: Because the Motion is unopposed, the Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer (ECF No.8 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant JPMorgan file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition on or before March 27, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/9/2017) (plp) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 03/07 2:56 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Deadline for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Answer ot Otherwise Respond filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NAAttorney Wm Lance Lewis added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank NA(pty:dft) (Lewis, Wm) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Deadline for JPMC to Answer or Otherwise Respond | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 03/01 9:49 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Vendor Resource Management re6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ferguson, Chris) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 03/01 9:48 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vendor Resource Management with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ferguson, Chris) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent
Fri 02/24 8:30 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are required to complete and return the enclosed form to the clerk within 20 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/24/2017) (plp) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Fri 02/24 8:25 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 3/23/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/24/2017) (plp) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Tue 02/21 3:49 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Ray. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 3:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vendor Resource Management identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PCV MURCOR, INC. for Vendor Resource Management. (Gray, Travis) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 02/21 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 78th District Court Wichita County, Texas, case number 185359-B-1 filed by Vendor Resource Management. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8223901) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gray, Travis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D |