Old Cutler Lakes by the Bay Recovery Inc
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12108 |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Debtor
Old Cutler Lakes by the Bay Recovery Inc
PO Box 924302
Homestead, FL 33092-4302 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Drew M Dillworth
2200 Museum Tower 150 West Flagler St
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 02/22/2017 1:03 PM EST |