Williams v. Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00025 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 3:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Larry Brown
In his/her official capacity as member of the Helena-West Helena City Council 918 Bank Street
Bakersfield, CA 93304 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joe St. Columbia, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wanda Crockett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Monica Davis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Don R Etherly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ever Jean Ford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Virgil Green
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vivian Holder
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John H Huff, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arsenio Jefferson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adrian Messina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandy Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Mon 10/30 2:32 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with19 the Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/30/2017. (kdr) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/30 11:58 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court finds that the case must be involuntarily dismissed without prejudice for failure to follow the Court's 10/16/2017 Order; and directing the Clerk to close the case. All pending motions are terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/30/2017. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/26 11:55 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re16 Order to Show Cause,14 MOTION to Compel ,17 Return of Service (Non Summons/Complaint),15 Brief in Support Of Service of Supplemental Discovery Responses (Valley, J.) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Return of Service (Non Summons/Complaint)
Wed 10/25 4:33 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE upon Sandy Williams c/o J.F. Valley re Motion/Brief/Order on 10/24/2017. (fjg) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 10/16 3:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ordering the Plaintiff to respond on or before 10/26/2017 to show cause as to why he has not responded to the Motion to Compel filed by All Defendants; and ordering a copy of this Order to Show Cause together with one copy of the Motion to Compel and accompanying brief be served by a U.S. Marshal upon the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/16/2017. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 10/16/2017 to correct a typographical error)(jak) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/16 3:25 PM
USM-285 form issued as to Sandy Williams with copies of14 Motion to Compel,15 Brief in Support, and16 Order to Show Cause and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
brief
Brief in Support
Wed 09/27 3:29 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re14 Motion to Compel filed by All Defendants. (Adams, Jenna) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Compel
Wed 09/27 3:28 PM
MOTION to Compel by All Defendants(Adams, Jenna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Tue 08/08 1:45 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot7 Defendants' Motion to Compel based upon the Court's communication with the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/8/2017. (sjh) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/07 2:54 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re8 Brief in Support,9 Order to Show Cause,,10 Response to Motion,7 MOTION to Compel Service of Discovery Responses (Valley, J.) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/03 10:01 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Compel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Valley, J.) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/25 2:26 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff file and respond to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas on or before 7/31/2017, to show cause why he has not responded to the7 Motion to Compel filed by the Defendants on 7/6/2017, and it is further ordered that a copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with one copy of the Motion to Compel and accompanying brief, shall be sent to the Plaintiff by certified mail. Plaintiff's failure to respond may result in dismissal of this action. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2017. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/25/2017. (mcz) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
brief
Brief in Support
Thu 07/06 12:23 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re7 Motion to Compel filed by All Defendants. (Adams, Jenna) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Compel
Thu 07/06 12:22 PM
MOTION to Compel by All Defendants(Adams, Jenna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/06 11:08 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/26/2018 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 12/15/2017; Motions due by 1/10/2018; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 2/23/2018; Status Report due by 1/25/2018. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/6/2017. (kog) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 04/24 10:42 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Larry Brown, Joe St. Columbia, Sr, Wanda Crockett, Monica Davis, Don R Etherly, Ever Jean Ford, Christopher Franklin, Virgil Green, Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of, Vivian Holder, John H Huff, Jr, Arsenio Jefferson, Adrian Messina. (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 02/27 3:06 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/1/2017; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/15/2017. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/26/2018 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/27/2017.(kog) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/22 8:24 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand, by all Defendants.(mcz) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 8:21 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sandy Williams. (mcz) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/22 8:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Phillips County Circuit Court, case number 54CV-16-337. Fee of $ 400 paid, receipt number LIT060593.(mcz) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |