Jones v. Mondi Bags USA LLC
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mondi Bags USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Jones
1904 Edmar Drive
Pine Bluff, AR 71603 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment
Thu 11/09 10:51 AM
JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2017. (ljb) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/08 1:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal PROPOSED ORDER by Mondi Bags USA LLC. (Saul, Micah) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/08 12:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mondi Bags USA LLC. (Saul, Micah) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/18 3:22 PM
ORDER: No new lawyer for Jones has appeared by the deadline, No.20 . Jones has not confirmed for the Court that he is proceeding pro se, but that is the situation. Jones should therefore familiarize himself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Court's Local Rules. Jones must follow all applicable rules as the case proceeds pursuant to the Final Scheduling Order, No.16 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2017. (jak) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Wed 08/23 1:28 PM
ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates Mickey Stevens's compliance with the Court's recent20 Order. Stevens is therefore relieved as counsel for Gary Jones in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/23/2017. (jak) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/21 9:43 AM
NOTICE by Gary Jones (Stevens, Mickey) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Deficiency Letter
Mon 08/14 8:28 AM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that21 Notice lacks a correctly formatted attorney's electronic signature (General Order 53). (jak) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/10 11:37 AM
NOTICE by Gary Jones in compliance with Order (20)(Stevens, Mickey) |
|
Att: 1 Document Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 2 Document Letter to Plaintiff | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 08/03 1:49 PM
ORDER denying as moot17 Motion; reluctantly granting19 Motion to Withdraw. Mr. Stevens will be relieved as counsel for Gary Jones, effective when Stevens files notice that he has provided the Clerk with contact information for Jones, including a mailing address, telephone number, and email address, provided Jones a copy of the Court's16 Final Scheduling Order, and provided Jones a copy of this Order. Jones is instructed to either get a new lawyer or file a paper notifying the Court that he will represent himself by 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/2017. (jak) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/02 11:52 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Jones (Stevens, Mickey) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Deficiency Letter
Mon 07/31 8:31 AM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney lacks an attorney's signature (General Order 53) (jak) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Sun 07/30 3:40 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Jones (Stevens, Mickey) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 4:39 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 1/22/2018. Motions due by 2/22/2018. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/19/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/12/2017. (slb) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 05/11 1:15 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Mondi Bags USA LLC. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Saul, Micah) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 04/25 2:27 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice as moot11 Motion for Reconsideration. Jones filed no stipulation to clarify what damages she is seeking, so the Court need not revisit the post-removal-stipulation issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/25/2017. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 04/11 9:40 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/11/2017. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/11/2017. (slb) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
brief
Brief in Support
Thu 03/30 11:28 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re11 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Mondi Bags USA LLC. (Marts, Gary) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Reconsideration
Thu 03/30 11:24 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re10 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, by Mondi Bags USA LLC (Marts, Gary) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Mon 03/27 1:02 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Remand to State Court without prejudice. This Court will keep this case unless Jones stipulates to capping potential recovery (including fees and costs) at an amount less than the jurisdictional minimum. Any stipulation is due by 4/24/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2017. (mcz) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/21 2:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mondi Bags USA LLC.(Young, Regina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kim Gholston | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Fri 03/17 1:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Mondi Bags USA LLC (Young, Regina) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 03/09 1:32 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gary Jones(Stevens, Mickey) |
|
Att: 1 Document Brief in Support of Motion to Remand | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/28 4:20 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Mondi Bags USA LLC.(Young, Regina) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 3:23 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. 3 & 4 , granted. If they have not already done so, Mssrs. Brian F. Jackson and Micah T. Saul must register with the CM/ECF for the Eastern District of Arkansas by 2 March 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/23/2017. (slb) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 10:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Micah T. Saul. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3004444. Filed by Mondi Bags USA LLC(Marts, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 10:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian F. Jackson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3004434. Filed by Mondi Bags USA LLC(Marts, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mondi Bags USA LLC, filed by Gary Jones.(kdr) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/22 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mondi Bags USA LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-17-5. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT060596.(kdr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |