Cramer v. Allstate Texas Lloyds
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Texas Lloyds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Cramer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/09 11:55 AM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: ORDERED that this cause be and hereby is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the refiling of same. It is further ORDERED that all costs of court are taxed against the parties incurring same. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/8/2018) (svc) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/07 9:18 AM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Mon 05/07 11:18 AM
Civil Case Terminated per stipulation. (svc) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 04/23 2:22 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/20/2018) (epm) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 04/09 3:29 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference is set for 8/9/2018 01:30 PM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/09 3:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/13/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 7/19/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/6/2018) (ran) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Tue 04/03 1:47 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Fri 03/30 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING:Case transferred. Current pretrial conference and trial setting canceled. Parties to submit Agreed Scheduling Order. (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 03/28 2:00 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 3/28/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Heather Hall; Defense - Mariah Baker Quiroz. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :21. (chmb) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply
Mon 03/26 1:49 PM
REPLY filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re:23 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fred Lupfer (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Reply
Mon 03/26 1:48 PM
REPLY filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re:20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Fri 03/23 10:15 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Status Conference set for 3/28/2018 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/23/2018) (axm) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 03/16 5:12 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Richard Cramer re33 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Response to MSJ (Hall, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H | ||
33 | 33
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 03/16 5:03 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Richard Cramer re32 Response/Objection to Summary Judgment Motion (Hall, Heather) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/16 5:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Richard Cramer re:20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hall, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 03/16 5:01 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Richard Cramer re30 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Response to Motion to Strike (Hall, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C | ||
30 | 30
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 03/16 4:58 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Richard Cramer re29 Response/Objection to Motion to Strike (Hall, Heather) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/16 4:56 PM
RESPONSE filed by Richard Cramer re:23 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fred Lupfer (Hall, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
6
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/12 8:44 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings per Special Order 3-318. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/8/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 03/07 8:30 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting26 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff to file responses to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to March 16, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/7/2018) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 03/06 8:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Fred Lupfer filed by Richard Cramer (Hall, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 02/16 1:29 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re23 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fred Lupfer (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Designation Expert Witnes, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Fred Lupfer Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit(s) of Mariah B. Quiroz, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Appraisal Demand, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Defendant's Response to Appraisal Demand | ||
24 | 24
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 02/16 1:22 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re23 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fred Lupfer (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Strike
Fri 02/16 1:16 PM
MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fred Lupfer filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Excluding Testimony of Fred Lupfer | ||
22 | 22
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 02/16 1:05 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Allstate Policy No. 229 339 019, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Richard Cramer Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Fred Lupfer Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit(s) of Cullen Shelton, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Claim File No. 000165032467, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Claim File No. 0287286462, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Claim File No. 0425185303, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Allstate Claim Notes | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 02/16 12:58 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 02/16 12:56 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 12/04 12:46 PM
Designation of Experts by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 11/30 4:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for mediation is on or before 3/15/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/30/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 11/29 10:11 AM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Mediation Deadline filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 11/03 10:00 AM
Designation of Experts by Richard Cramer. (Fadner, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Lupfer Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Lupfer Estimate, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Lupfer CV, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Lupfer Testimonial History | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/13 9:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/29 11:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, the court allows Eric K. Bowers to be withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Allstate Texas Lloyds ("Allstate"), and he is relieved of any further obligation to or representation of Allstate in this case. Mariah B. Quiroz is substituted in as Allstate's counsel of record. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/29/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Attorney
Thu 09/28 3:58 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Mariah Baker Quiroz,Mariah Baker Quiroz for Allstate Texas Lloyds. Motion filed by Allstate Texas LloydsAttorney Mariah Baker Quiroz added to party Allstate Texas Lloyds(pty:dft) (Quiroz, Mariah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/03 5:56 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT ON STATUS OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Higgins, Roger) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/05 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 6/4/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2017. Motions due by 2/16/2018. Discovery due by 2/2/2018. Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 5/7/2018. Settlement Status Report due by 8/3/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/5/2017) (ykp) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order For ADR
Fri 05/05 11:03 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are directed to participate in mediation by 12/15/17. The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/5/2017) (ash) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/02 4:41 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/31 11:14 AM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than 4/17/2017. Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/27 3:39 PM
ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/27/2017) (twd) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/24 11:23 AM
MOTION to Wave Local Counsel Requirement filed by Richard Cramer (McClenny, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant filed by Richard Cramer (McClenny, James) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/24 11:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richard Cramer. (McClenny, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Lindsay
Wed 02/22 11:29 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 9:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/22 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 134th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-00418 filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8226018) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B.1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B.2 - Civil Request Service Form, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) B.3 - Citation Issued (CM/RRR), Allstate served 1/23/17, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) B.4 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution hearing set for 3/27/17, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) B.5 - Return of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) B.6 - Defendant Allstate's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 9 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Cover Sheet Supplement |