Ulloa v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00497 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 3:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ulloa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/09 4:30 PM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Gorman, R) Modified text on 4/9/2018 |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Mon 04/09 4:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated per27 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 03/21 3:41 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re:20 MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Appraisal (Gorman, R) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 03/12 10:41 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Maria Ulloa re24 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,23 Response/Objection (Fadner, Derek) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 03/12 10:39 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maria Ulloa re23 Response/Objection (Fadner, Derek) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 03/12 10:37 PM
RESPONSE filed by Maria Ulloa re:20 MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Appraisal (Fadner, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 02/19 5:37 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Appraisal ,21 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment following Appraisal (Gorman, R) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 02/19 5:22 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Appraisal (Gorman, R) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 02/19 5:19 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Following Appraisal filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Gorman, R) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order GRANTING ALLSTATE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOLLOWING APPRAISAL | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 02/09 4:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Agreed Motion to Lift Administrative Case Closure Pending Appraisal. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/9/2018) (ykp) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 02/09 3:07 PM
MOTION to lift the administrative case closure and reinstate this matter on the Court's active docket filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Gorman, R) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/11 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Notice of Appraisal Award filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Gorman, R) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 10/12 11:43 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, the court allows Eric K. Bowers to be withdrawn as counsel for Defendant and he is relieved of any further obligation to or representation of Defendant in this case. R. Tate Gorman is substituted as attorney of record for Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/12/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 10/11 4:22 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney R Tate Gorman,R Tate Gorman for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Motion filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company Attorney R Tate Gorman added to party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gorman, R) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/29 1:18 PM
ORDER re:13 Agreed Motion to Abate Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal. The parties seek to abate this case pending completion of appraisal because there is a high likelihood that all or most of their dispute will be resolved upon completion of the appraisal. The court is not opposed to the relief sought by the parties; however, rather than abate the action, the court will administratively close it. Accordingly, the court determines that this case should be, and is hereby, administratively closed. The parties shall notify the court in writing within 14 days after completion of the appraisal process as to whether the action has been resolved. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/29/2017) (axm) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Fri 09/29 10:20 AM
Agreed MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Bowers, Eric) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/03 6:05 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT ON STATUS OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Higgins, Roger) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/05 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2017. Motions due by 1/19/2018. Discovery due by 1/5/2018. Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/9/2018. Settlement Status Report due by 8/3/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/5/2017) (ran) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order For ADR
Fri 05/05 10:29 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are directed to participate in mediation by 11/15/17.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/5/2017) (ash) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/02 4:10 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/31 11:25 AM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT : This conference shall take place no later than April 17, 2017. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for initiating the conference and for filing the Report. If Plaintiff is not represented by counsel, counsel for Defendant shall initiate the conference and file the Report. All counsel or unrepresented parties must participate in the conference. Joint Status Report is due by 5/2/2017. Failure to timely submit the Report may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal, without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (ndt) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/27 3:30 PM
ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/27/2017) (twd) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/24 10:32 AM
MOTION to Wave Local Counsel Requirement filed by Maria Ulloa (McClenny, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant filed by Maria Ulloa (McClenny, James) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/24 10:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Ulloa. (McClenny, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Lindsay
Wed 02/22 11:03 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/22 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC 17-00504 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8226321) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bowers, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B.1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B.2 - Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) B.3 - Citation Issued, CM, Allstate served 1/23/17, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) B.4 - Return of Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) B.5 - Defendant Allstate's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) B.6 - Order setting scheduling conference for 3/3/17, | ||
Att: 9 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Cover Sheet Supplement |