Leeper v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00507 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy International Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nanette Leeper
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Mon 03/14 1:56 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal(s) in the cases listed in Exhibit A. (chmb) |
||
Saturday, March 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Sat 03/12 12:08 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Vicki Archer. (Malik, Shezad) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/20 4:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Malik, Shezad) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 03/14 11:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Malik, Shezad) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/23 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Nanette Leeper (Malik, Shezad) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/23 10:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nanette Leeper. (Malik, Shezad) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Nanette Leeper. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8227320) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Malik, Shezad) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Supplement |