A Anthony Corp v. Brink's Incorporated
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00511 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Brink's Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
A Anthony Corp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 03/20 3:26 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD- filed in incorrect case*** AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants, ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY and DAVID ROBERT KALTENBACH, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED any relief not specifically granted herein is hereby denied. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/20/2018) (epm) Modified on 3/20/2018 (epm) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal re:1 Complaint, filed by A Anthony Corp (Hedrick, Lindsay) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/07 12:33 PM
Civil Case Terminated per6 Notice of Dismissal. (epm) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 03/03 12:54 PM
ORDER: Within ten days of this date, the plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/3/2017) (axm) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/23 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Brink's Incorporated. (ran) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Fish
Thu 02/23 9:00 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/22 6:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A. Anthony Corp.. (Hedrick, Lindsay) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 6:13 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Brink's Incorporated filed by A. Anthony Corp.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8228731) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hedrick, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) H |