Lee v. Seminole Police Department et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Mon 03/13 10:34 AM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's Order of even date, it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that Plaintiff's civil rights complaint is dismissed with prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (bdg) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous
Mon 03/13 10:32 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS: Plaintiff's complaint and all claims alleged therein are dismissed with prejudice as frivolous and for failure to state a claim. This dismissal shall count as a qualifying dismissal under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A, 42 U.S.C. 1997e, and Adepegba v. Hammons, 103 F.3d 383 (5th Cir. 1996). Plaintiff is cautioned that if he accumulates three strikes, he may not proceed in forma pauperis in any civil action or appeal filed while he is incarcerated or detained in any facility unless he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Judgment shall be entered accordingly. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/13/2017) (bdg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/13 10:35 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Mon Mar 13 10:35:04 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order For Partial Filing Fee
Thu 03/09 11:19 AM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 filing fee in monthly installments with no initial partial fee assessed. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/9/2017) (egp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/09 11:20 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Copy also sent to Gaines County Inmate Accounting Office Thu Mar 9 11:20:44 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 03/07 2:15 PM
Brief in Support filed by Timothy Patrick Lee re1 Complaint. (cb) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/06 3:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Timothy Patrick Lee (cb) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 02/24 12:25 PM
FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: Timothy Patrick Lee must address the following deficiency: Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee or File an Amended Complaint, Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal Deadline to cure the deficiency is within twenty (20) days. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/24/2017) (cb) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/24 12:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Feb 24 12:27:22 CST 2017 (crt) Modified (application and cert mailed) on 2/24/2017 (cb) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 02/22 4:50 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (cb) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Wed 02/22 4:50 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/22 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Patrick Lee. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cb) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/22 4:51 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Wed Feb 22 16:51:18 CST 2017 (crt) |