Mary Kay Inc. v. Ayon et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00483 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Arturo Ayon
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-100
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary Kay Inc
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
Abandoned case - Plaintiff advised that case is proceeding under another civil action number. (ash) |