City of Richmond v. M/V Black Hawk et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00931 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 22, 2017 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
M/V Black Hawk
|
|
Defendant
M/V Black Kite
|
|
Interested Party
United States of America
Torts Branch, Civil Division U.S. Department of Justice P.O. Box 36028 450 Golden Gate Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Richmond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Wed 09/12 2:30 PM
ORDER by Judge James Donato re 34 Motion for Forfeiture of Property. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
service
USMS Bill of Sale
Mon 05/07 1:03 PM
U.S. Marshal's Bill of Sale of Vessel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/30 10:52 AM
Report of Sale of M/V Black Hawk filed by David M. Key, Deputy U.S. Marshal. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/20 10:03 AM
NOTICE by City of Richmond Plaintiff City of Richmond's Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 4/20/2018) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/20 8:39 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of Richmond. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 4/20/2018) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Transcript
Wed 03/28 5:23 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/08/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold, telephone number 218-355-8781. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2018. (veS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Transcript Order
Tue 03/13 1:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/08/2018 before Judge James Donato by City of Richmond, for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 3/13/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 03/08 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2018. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2018) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 02/09 10:23 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byCity of Richmond.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/9/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 01/30 3:34 PM
Declaration in Support of34 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property filed byChristopher Holbrook. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Forfeiture of Property
Tue 01/30 3:25 PM
MOTION for Forfeiture of Property filed by Christopher Holbrook. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/9/2018. Replies due by 2/16/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/23 4:09 PM
Notice of Dispute of Sale filed by Christopher Holbrook (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
service
USMS Bill of Sale
Fri 01/05 3:45 PM
U.S. Marshal's Bill of Sale of Vessel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 11/09 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Report of Sale of M/V Black Kite by United States Marshal Service. (tnS) (Filed on 11/7/2017) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/31 9:02 AM
NOTICE by City of Richmond Proof of Publication (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 10/31/2017) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Mon 10/23 11:08 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 28 Ex Parte Application. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Ex Parte Application
Wed 10/18 3:01 PM
Ex Parte Application for an Order Allowing Inspection, Survey, and Testing of the Arrested Vessels by Prospective Bidders in Advance of the Admiralty Sale of the Vessels filed by City of Richmond.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
service
USMS Bill of Sale
Thu 08/17 1:57 PM
U.S. Marshal's Bill of Sale of Vessel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/04 7:44 AM
NOTICE by City of Richmond re25 Judgment, Terminate Motions, Terminate Deadlines Plaintiff City of Richmond's Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 8/4/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Wed 06/28 9:53 AM
JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR SALE OF VESSEL AND CREDIT BID. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 06/28 8:37 AM
Order granting 23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 06/27 12:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re21 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiff's Application for (1) Default Judgment by Court; (2) Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Conduct Admiralty Execution Sale of Vessel; or Alternatively; (3) For an Interlocutory Sale; and (4) filed by United States of America. (Underhill, R.) (Filed on 6/27/2017) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/27 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by R. Michael Underhill (Underhill, R.) (Filed on 6/27/2017) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default Judgment - by the Court
Fri 05/19 9:37 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiff's Application for (1) Default Judgment by Court; (2) Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Conduct Admiralty Execution Sale of Vessel; or Alternatively; (3) For an Interlocutory Sale; and (4) Authorizing Plaintiff to Credit Bid at Sale filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 6/2/2017. Replies due by 6/9/2017.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 5/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Marc A. Centor in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment and Order for Sale of Vessel and Credit Bid | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 05/18 1:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 7/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 05/18 9:34 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Management Statement filed by City of Richmond. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 5/18/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default
Thu 04/27 11:36 AM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to M/V Black Hawk, M/V Black Kite and All Non-Appearing Persons and Entities. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 04/19 11:25 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default of All Non-Appearing Persons or Entities filed by City of Richmond. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 04/19 11:22 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default as to the Defendant Vessels filed by City of Richmond. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 10:05 AM
NOTICE by City of Richmond Plaintiff City of Richmond's Proof of Publication (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 03/13 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Richmond Process Receipt and Return (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Warrant Issued
Tue 02/28 9:11 AM
Warrant for Arrest of Vessel. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/24 1:06 PM
Summons Issued as to M/V Black Hawk, M/V Black Kite. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Fri 02/24 12:46 PM
Order by Hon. James Donato granting 5 Ex Parte Application to Appoint Substitute Custodian. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Fri 02/24 12:31 PM
Order by Hon. James Donato granting 3 Ex Parte Application for Arrest of Vessels. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 02/24 2:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 10:00 AM.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 02/23 2:25 PM
Case assigned to Hon. James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/23 2:20 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Richmond.. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
6 | 6
misc
New Case Filing Fee
Thu 02/23 2:15 PM
FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-11180196). (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Ex Parte Application
Thu 02/23 12:26 PM
Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Appointing Substitute Custodian filed by City of Richmond.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of David Shoemaker, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/23 12:22 PM
NOTICE by City of Richmond Notice of Request for Immediate Review of Maritime Arrest and Declaration in Support Thereof (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Ex Parte Application
Thu 02/23 12:19 PM
Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing the Issuance of a Warrant of Maritime Arrest filed by City of Richmond.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Arrest Warrant, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 02/23 12:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/23 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Verified Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byCity of Richmond.(Centor, Marc) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 02/23 1:22 PM
Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint filed by City of Richmond. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |