DeHaven Home and Garden
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Ann Whipple |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30431 |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2018 |
Debtor
DeHaven Home and Garden
2211 W Spring St
Lima, OH 45805-2534 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
William L. Swope
610 Tiffin Avenue
Findlay, OH 45840 |
Docket last updated: 02/24/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 02/23 3:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-30431 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 35425885. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 02/23 3:20 PM
341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at Federal Building Lima. (admin, ) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 02/23 3:13 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by DeHaven Home and Garden (French, Bruce aty) |
|
2 | 2
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Thu 02/23 3:28 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor DeHaven Home and Garden. (French, Bruce aty) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 02/23 3:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor DeHaven Home and Garden. (French, Bruce aty) |