Green v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Richard H Kyle |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 22, 2017 3:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nikea Green
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 06/29 8:46 AM
JUDGMENT(JDF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/28 10:36 AM
ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, with the Court retaining jurisdiction for 60 days to permit any party to move to reopen for good cause shown or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 6/28/17. (KLL) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/27 10:05 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Life Insurance Company of North America Re: Notice of Settlement . (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 06/07 3:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Rule 16 Discovery Conference held by telephone on 5/30/2017. Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 05/17 11:36 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Nikea Green.(Santos, Margaret) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 05/09 8:16 AM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (ERISA CASES): Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2017 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/8/2017.(lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 11:22 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Coproration is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 11:18 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 4:46 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/07 8:48 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 03/07/2017. (MMG) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/06 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/23/2017, answer due 4/24/2017. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Mon 03/06 3:49 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5370064 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/06 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 02/23 2:43 PM
ORDER regarding Judge Richard H. Kyle's dispositive motion procedure. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 2/23/17. (KLL) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/23 11:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (JDF) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 02/23 11:43 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 17-cv-556 RHK/HB. (JDF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/23 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5351847.) Filed by Nikea Green. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) Modified text on 2/23/2017 (JDF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |