Erath Iron and Metal RE LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40693
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40693
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40723 |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Converted: | Oct 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Erath Iron and Metal RE LLC
PO Box 186
Stephenville, TX 76401-0003 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Shawn K. Brown
Chapter 7 Trustee PO Box 93749
Southlake, TX 76092 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 01/28/2019 9:02 AM CST |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/24 12:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload 17-40723 11) [caseupld,1032u] (1717.00). Receipt number 23360092, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
27
pgs
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (case upload)
Fri 02/24 12:03 PM
Non-Individual Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 - case upload. filed by Russell W. King on behalf of Erath Iron and Metal RE LLC. (King, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Schedules
Fri 02/24 12:09 PM
Schedules: A/B,. Filed by Debtor Erath Iron and Metal RE LLC. (King, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Employ
Fri 02/24 12:21 PM
Application to employ Russell W. King as Attorney Filed by Debtor Erath Iron and Metal RE LLC (King, Russell) |