Kompass Maintenance Company, LLC
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kay Woods |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40300 |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2017 |
Debtor
Kompass Maintenance Company, LLC
551 Edward Ln
Campbell, OH 44405-1206 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Michael D. Buzulencia
150 E Market Street Suite 300
Warren, OH 44481 |
Docket last updated: 02/25/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/24 3:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-40300 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 35434055. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 02/24 3:40 PM
341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/11/2017 at 12:00 PM at Federal Bldg Youngstown - 341 Meeting Room, 3rd Floor. (admin, ) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 02/24 3:35 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Kompass Maintenance Company, LLC. Schedule A/B due 03/10/2017. Schedule D due 03/10/2017. Schedule E/F due 03/10/2017. Schedule G due 03/10/2017. Schedule H due 03/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/10/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 03/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 03/10/2017. (Suhar, Andrew aty) Modified on 2/24/2017 (mbokr) |
|
2 | 2
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Fri 02/24 3:44 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Kompass Maintenance Company, LLC. (Suhar, Andrew aty) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 02/24 3:52 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Kompass Maintenance Company, LLC. (Suhar, Andrew aty) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Documents to be Filed - Youngstown
Fri 02/24 4:46 PM
Notice of Documents to be Filed - Youngstown - Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities, - Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H, - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual, and - Statement of Your Financial Affairs. (mbokr) |