General Sign, Inc.
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40377 |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2017 |
Debtor
General Sign, Inc.
7924 Paisley
The Colony, TX 75056-6523 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Docket last updated: 02/25/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/24 12:13 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (fee)-case upload 17-40377 [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9777907, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7, All Schedules & Statements [fee]-case upload
Fri 02/24 12:12 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). filed by Grant S. Goens of Law Office of Grant S. Goens, PLLC on behalf of General Sign, Inc.. Document Due 3/3/2017. (Goens, Grant) |