Cardiovascular Care Group, Inc. et al v. eClinicalworks, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01610 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1334(b) Proceeding arising/related to case under title 11 |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 23, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Alan M. Weems
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Cardiovascular Care Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Alan M. Weems
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
eClinicalworks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Change Healthcare Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Change Healthcare Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alan M. Weems
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
eClinicalworks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cardiovascular Care Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
|
|
Third Party Defendant
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Alan M. Weems
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
66 | 66
order
Order Remanding Case to Bankruptcy Court
Mon 05/01 9:02 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/28/2017. (Attachment(s) : #1 Transfer Letter) (clc) |
|
65 | 65
motion
Transfer Case
Fri 04/28 3:24 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Bankruptcy Court by Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/31/2017.(DeLeo, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
64 | 64
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 04/28 11:00 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Garner Jarboe (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6108127),59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward Steele Clayton, IV (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6108108).**Documents do not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings mustreflect Section E and Magistrate 4.** (clc) |
|
63 | 63
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 04/28 10:55 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re58 MOTION to Transfer Case to Bankruptcy Court .**Motion no longer deemed Deficient.** (clc) |
|
62 | 62
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Fri 04/28 10:47 AM
ORDER granting61 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Robin Ronquillo DeLeo for Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/28/2017. (clc) |
|
61 | 61
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Fri 04/28 9:37 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Robin R. De Leo of The De Leo Law Firm, LLC by Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC.(Thornhill, Tommy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
60 | 60
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/27 1:29 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Garner Jarboe (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6108127) by Change Healthcare Holdings, Inc..(Walker, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Form, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
59 | 59
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/27 1:25 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward Steele Clayton, IV (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6108108) by Change Healthcare Holdings, Inc..(Walker, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Form, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
58 | 58
motion
Transfer Case
Wed 04/26 6:34 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Bankruptcy Court by Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/26/2017.(DeLeo, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
57 | 57
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Ronquillo DeLeo on behalf of Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC. Attorney Robin Ronquillo DeLeo added to party Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC(pty:dft).(DeLeo, Robin) |
|
56 | 56
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/25 4:30 PM
ORDER granting55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin P. Riche terminated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/25/2017. (clc) |
|
55 | 55
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/25 1:45 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Kevin P. Riche as Attorney for Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC, Alan M. Weems MD by Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC, Alan M. Weems, Alan M. Weems, Alan M. Weems.Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC(pty:crc), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Neurological Surgery of Covington, PLLC(pty:cc), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Alan M. Weems(pty:3pp), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Alan M. Weems(pty:crc), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Alan M. Weems(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Alan M. Weems(pty:cc).(Riche, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
54 | 54
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 04/24 10:24 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re52 Response/Reply. ** Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 48. Clerk properly linked document to document 48.** (clc) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
53 | 53
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 4:31 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cardiovascular Care Group, Inc. re49 MOTION to Stay . (Carlisle, Laura) |
|
52 | 52
misc
Response/Reply
Fri 04/21 11:40 AM
Response/Reply by LMCHH PCP, LLC to48 MOTION to Stay with Request for Expedited Relief (Mintz, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |