Drone LC, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10426 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lily Robotics, Inc.
374 Harriet St
San Francisco, CA 94103-4716 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Drone startup Lily Robotics files for bankruptcy (forbes.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/01/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
793 | 793
claims
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135
Thu 10/25 11:24 AM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/23 1:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case 17-10426 Closed (LMD) |