Irasel Sand, LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeff Bohm |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31148 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Irasel Sand, LLC
15 Fairway Oaks Pl
The Woodlands, TX 77380-0986 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 07/06 2:54 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ltie) |
||
Sunday, July 02, 2017 | ||
208 | 208
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/02 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 07/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
207 | 207
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/30 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 06/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
206 | 206
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Fri 06/30 9:31 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to204 Transcript,205 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
205 | 205
84
pgs
court
Transcript
Thu 06/29 5:01 PM
Transcript RE: #1 - Continued Status Conference; #39 - Final Hearing on Cash Collateral; #143 - Final Hearing on DIP Financing; and #159 - Application to Employ Special Counsel held on May 18, 2017 before Judge Jeff Bohm. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 09/27/2017. (mhen) |
|
204 | 204
33
pgs
court
Transcript
Thu 06/29 4:58 PM
Transcript RE: #58 - Motion to Pay Critical Vendors; $7 - Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages (Cont'd); and #6 - Motion to Continue held on March 30, 2017 before Judge Jeff Bohm. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 09/27/2017. (mhen) |