10 Oneida Street Corp.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-71097 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Debtor
10 Oneida Street Corp.
10 Oneida St
Deer Park, NY 11729-3523 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert L. Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 02/28/2017 12:03 AM EST |
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Mon 02/27 3:26 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Business & Appointment of Chapter 7 Trustee, Robert L. Pryor, , 341(a) |
||
court
Prior Filings
Mon 02/27 3:28 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 16-74192 ast (Dismissed on 12/23/2016) (ssw) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Mon 02/27 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00. Receipt Number 249677. (SW) (admin) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 02/27 3:26 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by 10 Oneida Street Corp. (ssw) |
|
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 7
Mon 02/27 3:31 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 2/27/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 2/27/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 2/27/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/13/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/13/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/13/2017. Schedule G due 3/13/2017. Schedule H due 3/13/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/13/2017. (ssw) |
|
3 | 3
court
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
Mon 02/27 3:32 PM
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (ssw) |