EMAS Chiyoda Subsea Inc. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-31146. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31139 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EMAS Chiyoda Subsea Inc.
825 Town and Country Ln Ste 1500
Houston, TX 77024-2238 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Mon 02/05 1:05 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: No 433 (McCreight, Curtis) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 01/24 2:58 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: (Brown, Charla) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Thu 12/07 1:07 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 13 Filed by Louisiana Department of Revenue (Jarreau, Bridget) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 03/03 8:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christine A March (March, Christine) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:41 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Courtney Hull Filed by on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Hull, Courtney) |
|
3 | 3
7
pgs
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:29 AM
Order (I) Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/28/2017. (tcam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 12:59 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor EMAS Chiyoda Subsea Inc. Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 02/27 7:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by EMAS Chiyoda Subsea Inc.. (Higgins, John) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/27 9:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31139 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18766384. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |