EMAS CHIYODA ROV Pte. Ltd. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-31146. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31145 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EMAS CHIYODA ROV Pte. Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Sunday, August 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/27 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Fri 08/25 10:45 AM
Order Dismissing and Closing Case. Signed on 8/25/2017 (mrios) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 08/25 10:56 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (mrios) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:44 AM
Order (I) Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/28/2017. (tcam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 1:07 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor EMAS CHIYODA ROV Pte. Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 02/27 9:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by EMAS CHIYODA ROV Pte. Ltd.. (Higgins, John) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/27 10:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31145 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18766418. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |