EMAS CHIYODA Subsea Services LLC DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-31146. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31151 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EMAS CHIYODA Subsea Services LLC
1 N Rodney Dr
Wilmington, DE 19809-3317 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Sunday, August 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/27 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Fri 08/25 10:51 AM
Order Dismissing and Closing Case. Signed on 8/25/2017 (mrios) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 08/25 10:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (mrios) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:53 AM
Order (I) Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/28/2017. (tcam) |
|
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Tue 02/28 6:30 AM
|
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 1:12 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor EMAS CHIYODA Subsea Services LLC (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 02/28 9:41 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (RobbieWestmoreland) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 02/27 10:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by EMAS CHIYODA Subsea Services LLC. (Higgins, John) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/27 11:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31151 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18766464. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |