EMAS Saudi Arabia Ltd. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-31146. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31154 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EMAS Saudi Arabia Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Sunday, December 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 12/23 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Fri 12/21 12:53 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases of (I) Emas Chiyoda Subsea Services PTE. LTD., (II) Emas Chiyoda Subsea Marine Base, LLC, and (III) Emas Saudi Arabia, Ltd., Signed on 12/21/2018. (rcas) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 8:57 AM
Order (I) Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/28/2017. (tcam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 02/28 1:17 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor EMAS Saudi Arabia Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 02/27 11:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by EMAS Saudi Arabia Ltd.. (Higgins, John) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/27 11:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31154 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18766464. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |