HELICRAFT HOLDINGS, LLC
Montana Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Benjamin P Hursh |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-60120 |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
HELICRAFT HOLDINGS, LLC
77547 US Highway 93
Saint Ignatius, MT 59865-9476 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE
U.S. TRUSTEE'S OFFICE LIBERTY CENTER SUITE 204 301 CENTRAL AVE
GREAT FALLS, MT 59401 |
GPO
Oct 18 2017
Memorandum of Decision (related documents(s) 70 Application for Compensation filed by Spec. Counsel PAUL J. PETIT). (Grady, Colleen) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
court
Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 04/27 4:02 PM
Final Decree - Case Has Been Fully Administered. IT IS ORDERED, that the Trustee, if any, is discharged. BANKRUPTCY CASE CLOSED. Copies mailed to Debtor(s)' Attorney, Debtor(s) if not represented by counsel, Trustee and U.S. Trustee. (Grady, Colleen) |