Kimbob, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Henry W Van Eck |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00836 |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Converted: | Mar 14, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Kimbob, Inc.
PO Box 5
Camp Hill, PA 17001-0005 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
** No Trustee Appointed Yet **
|
Docket last updated: 04/12/2019 6:04 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Wed 03/01 5:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:17-bk-00836) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8263376, amount $ 1717.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
34
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/01 5:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1717.00. Filed by Kelly M Walsh of Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C. on behalf of Kimbob, Inc.. (Walsh, Kelly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Wed 03/01 5:16 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Kelly M Walsh of Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C. on behalf of Kimbob, Inc. . (Walsh, Kelly) |