Old Dominion Holdings, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40590 |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Old Dominion Holdings, Inc.
1990 N California Blvd Fl 8TH
Walnut Creek, CA 94596-7261 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 03/28 3:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (trw) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Wed 03/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Dismissal
Wed 03/22 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Dismissal. . Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 03/20 10:48 AM
Order of Dismissal . (mab) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/08 9:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lynette C. Kelly. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak (Kelly, Lynette) |
|
Sunday, March 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes
Sun 03/05 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. . Notice Date 03/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Status Conference in Ch 11
Sat 03/04 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Status Conference in Ch 11. . Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/04 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 03/04 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Payment of Taxes
Thu 03/02 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin) |
|
5 | 5
court
Generate 341 Notices
Thu 03/02 5:50 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (pw) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Status Conference
Thu 03/02 5:49 PM
Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 4/25/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (pw) |
|
3 | 3
order
File Missing Documents
Thu 03/02 5:45 PM
Order To File Required Documents and Notice Regarding Dismissal Non-Compliance (Documents) due by 3/16/2017 (pw) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Creditor Matrix
Wed 03/01 4:52 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Old Dominion Holdings, Inc. (Bauer, R.) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/01 4:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1717, Filed by Old Dominion Holdings, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 03/8/2017.Incomplete Filings due by 03/15/2017. (Bauer, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Authorization to Sign | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/01 5:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-40590 [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 27260868, amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)
Wed 03/01 11:45 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/03/2017 at 09:00 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. Proof of Claim due by 07/03/2017. (admin, ) |