New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:17-cv-01527
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1337sc Sherman-Clayton Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2017 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Panasonic Avionics Corporation
Represented By
Ari Joseph Savitzky
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Steven Franklin Cherry
contact info
Hallie Beth Levin
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Leon Greenfield
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr L.L.P. (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
CoKinetic Systems, Corp.
Represented By
Todd Andrew Higgins
Crosby & Higgins, LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, June 12, 2017
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 3:47 PM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. (Motions due by 7/31/2017.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/12/2017) (ras)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/28/2017. Replies due by 9/18/2017. (ras)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
22 22 misc Letter Tue 5:00 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Todd A. Higgins, Esq. dated May 9, 2017 Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp..(Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDERED: Defendant may file its motion to dismiss by June 30, 2017. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by July 28, 2017. Any reply by defendant shall be filed by August 18, 2017. Discovery is stayed. The parties shall advise whether they agree with the Court's strong recommendation that they retain a private mediator. Joint Letter due May 10, and as further set forth. Motions due by 6/30/2017. Responses due by 7/28/2017 Replies due by 8/18/2017. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/5/2017) (ras)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2017. See, Scheduling Order dated 5/5/2017. (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
20 20 misc Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference Fri 4:01 PM
INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp..(Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
19 19 misc Letter Wed 7:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Todd A. Higgins, Esq. dated April 12, 2017 re: Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp..(Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
18 18 misc Letter Thu 5:01 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Steven F. Cherry dated April 6, 2017 re: Pre-Motion Letter - Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Panasonic Avionics Corporation.(Cherry, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
17 17 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 5:34 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation of North America, Other Affiliate Panasonic Corporation for Panasonic Avionics Corporation. Document filed by Panasonic Avionics Corporation.(Levin, Hallie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
16 16 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 9:47 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leon B. Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 9:46 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Steven F. Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 8:42 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Leon B. Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 8:44 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 13 MOTION for Steven F. Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459744. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 6:07 PM
MOTION for Leon B. Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panasonic Avionics Corporation.(Greenfield, Leon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 5:49 PM
MOTION for Steven F. Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459744. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panasonic Avionics Corporation.(Cherry, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia,
Att: 4 Certificate of Good Standing DC,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 13, 2017
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 3:02 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Panasonic Avionics Corporation answer due 4/6/2017. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/10/2017) (mro)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hallie Beth Levin on behalf of Panasonic Avionics Corporation. New Address: Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street, New York, New York, United States of America 10007, 212-295-6710. (Levin, Hallie)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 4:45 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Hallie B. Levin dated March 10, 2017. Document filed by Panasonic Avionics Corporation.(Levin, Hallie)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Joseph Savitzky on behalf of Panasonic Avionics Corporation. (Savitzky, Ari)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Beth Levin on behalf of Panasonic Avionics Corporation. (Levin, Hallie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
7 7 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 1:04 PM
ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/5/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, before Judge P. Kevin Castel, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 03/08/2017) (ap) Modified on 3/8/2017 (ap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 1:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Panasonic Avionics Corporation served on 3/2/2017, answer due 3/23/2017. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam Registered Agen. Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp.. (Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Panasonic Avionics Corporation. (jvs)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 12:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Todd Andrew Higgins. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 9999000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 0. (jvs)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jvs)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 12:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (jvs)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12:35 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jvs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 9:45 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Panasonic Avionics Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp.. (Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 9:40 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp..(Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 9:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 9:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Panasonic Avionics Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13367662)Document filed by CoKinetic Systems, Corp..(Higgins, Todd)
Related: [-]