Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP v. Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | David L Russell |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc
Terminated: 08/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP
Terminated: 08/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/22 7:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP. (Powell, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 08/17 4:47 PM
ANSWER to24 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP(a Texas limited partnership).(Powell, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 08/03 11:52 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint , AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP by Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc.(Pierce, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/01 2:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/1/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Honorable David L. Russell. Motions due by 1/1/2018. Pretrial Report due by 3/1/2018.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 08/01/2017. (md) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Tue 08/01 2:14 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to file Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Defendant shall file their Amended Answer within five days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 08/01/2017. (md) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 07/27 8:52 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Notice of Withdrawal of Objection filed by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP. (Powell, Courtney) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
Mon 07/24 5:41 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Counter Defendant Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP, Plaintiff Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP. (Powell, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave
Thu 07/06 3:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc.(Hampton, Joe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Answer and Counterclaim | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 06/28 3:25 PM
ANSWER to16 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP.(Davies, Shannon) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
misc
Docket
Wed 06/14 8:19 AM
DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2017 09:30 AM Room #3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 7/24/2017. (jw) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
14
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 06/09 2:49 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff , COUNTERCLAIM against Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP by Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc.(Pierce, Amy) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/08 6:09 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Jason Thomas.(Dunn, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 05/30 10:57 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary A Hudson on behalf of Jason Thomas (Hudson, Hilary) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 05/30 10:49 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A Dunn on behalf of Jason Thomas (Dunn, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/26 2:46 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason Thomas. (kw) |
|
11 | 11
10
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/26 1:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Containing Claim against Jason Thomas filed by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP.(Powell, Courtney) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 04/28 3:09 PM
ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP.(Davies, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Counterclaim
Thu 04/06 10:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP by Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc.(Pierce, Amy) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/27 9:57 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc answer due 4/6/2017.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/27/17. (jw) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 03/24 2:32 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Joe M Hampton on behalf of All Defendants (Hampton, Joe) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/24 2:21 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE by Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc. (Pierce, Amy) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 03/24 2:18 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Amy J Pierce on behalf of All Defendants (Pierce, Amy) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/09 11:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP. Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc served on 3/7/2017. (Powell, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 03/08 1:47 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP (Powell, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/01 3:32 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc. (kw) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/01 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Rose Creek Property Owners Association Inc filed by Tour 18 at Rose Creek LP.(kw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Wed 03/01 4:04 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:17-cv-00225-R Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2447431. (Davies, Shannon) |